NEW MING INC. v. ZHUANG
Plaintiff: NEW MING INC.
Defendant: ZHONG ZHUANG
Case Number: 1:2022cv11020
Filed: June 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: M Page Kelley
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2022 Filing 20 Opposition re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by NEW MING INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A of Opp'n to MTD)(Huang, Ye)
August 24, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Azzara on behalf of ZHONG ZHUANG (Azzara, Christopher)
August 19, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M Stacko on behalf of ZHONG ZHUANG (Stacko, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2022 Filing 17 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge (Huang, Ye) Modified on 8/18/2022 to fix docket text and event type. (Vieira, Leonardo).
August 15, 2022 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Pursuant to the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Section (G) Number (4): Any memorandum of law or other attachment filed in support of a main document shall be filed as a separate document, using the proper event. (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 12, 2022 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ZHONG ZHUANG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Vieira, Leonardo)
August 12, 2022 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Ferguson, Kerry)
August 12, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ZHONG ZHUANG.(Cocheteux, Christine) (Main Document 13 replaced on 8/15/2022) (Vieira, Leonardo).
August 9, 2022 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jeffrey M. Stacko. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 4, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jeffrey M. Stacko Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9442411 by ZHONG ZHUANG.(Cocheteux, Christine)
August 4, 2022 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Christopher J. Azzara. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 3, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher Azzara Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9440631 by ZHONG ZHUANG.(Cocheteux, Christine)
August 3, 2022 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. In light of #7 the parties' stipulation, defendant's response to plaintiff's complaint is due on or before August 12, 2022. (Ferguson, Kerry)
August 3, 2022 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, To Extend Time to Respond by ZHONG ZHUANG. (Cocheteux, Christine)
July 29, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine L. Cocheteux on behalf of ZHONG ZHUANG (Cocheteux, Christine)
June 28, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ZHONG ZHUANG. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
June 28, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
June 28, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NEW MING INC. Re-Docket by Court Staff. Please note Corporate Disclosure Statement is to be filed as separate docket entry. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
June 28, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ye Huang on behalf of NEW MING INC. Re-Docket by Court Staff. Please note Notice of Appearance is to be filed as separate docket entry. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
June 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT New Ming Inc. against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9387526 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by NEW MING INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, # 3 (Huang, Ye) Modified docket text on 6/28/2022 to remove and re-docket notice of appearance and corporate disclosure as separate docket entries. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEW MING INC. v. ZHUANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW MING INC.
Represented By: Ye Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZHONG ZHUANG
Represented By: Christopher J Azzara
Represented By: Christine L. Cocheteux
Represented By: Jeffrey M Stacko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?