Isaac et al v. Blendtec, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shelly Isaac, Alexander Zamudio and Steve Oberly
Defendant: Blendtec, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv11254
Filed: August 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2022 Filing 12 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Harper T. Segui. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Kelly, Danielle)
September 13, 2022 Filing 11 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Rachel Soffin. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Kelly, Danielle)
September 13, 2022 Filing 10 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Erin J. Ruben. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Kelly, Danielle)
September 12, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Harper T. Segui Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9492988 by Shelly Isaac, Steve Oberly, Alexander Zamudio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Harper T. Segui)(Straus, Alex)
September 12, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Rachel Soffin Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9492987 by Shelly Isaac, Steve Oberly, Alexander Zamudio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Rachel Soffin)(Straus, Alex)
September 12, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Erin J. Ruben Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9492985 by Shelly Isaac, Steve Oberly, Alexander Zamudio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Erin J. Ruben)(Straus, Alex)
August 29, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Shelly Isaac, Steve Oberly, Alexander Zamudio. Blendtec, Inc. served on 8/25/2022, answer due 9/15/2022. Acknowledgement filed by Shelly Isaac; Steve Oberly; Alexander Zamudio. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Straus, Alex)
August 5, 2022 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Complaint, by Shelly Isaac, Steve Oberly, Alexander Zamudio. (Straus, Alex)
August 5, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Blendtec, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
August 5, 2022 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
August 5, 2022 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
August 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blendtec, Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9442822 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Shelly Isaac, Steve Oberly, Alexander Zamudio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Straus, Alex).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isaac et al v. Blendtec, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly Isaac
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Represented By: Harper T. Segui
Represented By: Rachel L. Soffin
Represented By: Erin J. Ruben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Zamudio
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Represented By: Harper T. Segui
Represented By: Rachel L. Soffin
Represented By: Erin J. Ruben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Oberly
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Represented By: Harper T. Segui
Represented By: Rachel L. Soffin
Represented By: Erin J. Ruben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blendtec, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?