Hounsell v. Crowd Lending Fund LLC et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Hounsell
Defendant: Crowd Lending Fund LLC, Daniel Najarian, Wilmington Trust, N.A., Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, David Bernadino, Michael Van Dam and Giangrasso Law, Korde and Associates, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2022cv11314
Filed: August 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with certificate of service by John S. McNicholas on behalf of Giangrasso Law, Korde and Associates, P.C., Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (McNicholas, John)
September 16, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with certificate of service by Giangrasso Law, Korde and Associates, P.C., Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - K&A Entity details sheet from MA SOS, #2 B - Crowd Lending entity details sheet from MA SOS)(McNicholas, John)
September 2, 2022 Filing 16 Copy re #1 Complaint, #14 Order on Motion for Discovery, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #15 Summons Issued, mailed to Patricia Hounsell on 9/2/2022. (Dore, Samantha)
September 2, 2022 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to David Bernadino, Crowd Lending Fund LLC, Giangrasso Law, Korde and Associates, P.C., Daniel Najarian, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Michael Van Dam, Wilmington Trust, N.A.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Dore, Samantha)
September 2, 2022 Filing 14 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. The motion (ECF No. #12 ) for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The emergency motion (ECF No. #6 ) for discovery is DENIED without prejudice. As discussed at the motion hearing, defense counsel is to provide plaintiff with certain documents discussed on the record. (Dore, Samantha)
August 24, 2022 Filing 13 Letter/request (non-motion) from Patricia Hounsell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(de Oliveira, Flaviana)
August 24, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Patricia Hounsell.(de Oliveira, Flaviana).
August 17, 2022 Filing 11 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying without prejudice #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis because the application form is incomplete. Plaintiff failed to completely answer Questions 3 and 5 on the application. If plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, within 14 days, plaintiff shall either pay the $402 filing fee or file a renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (PSSA, 4)
August 17, 2022 Filing 10 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Motion Hearing held by video on 8/17/2022. Case called; Arguments heard; Court denied #2 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order as stated on the record. Defense counsel to provide plaintiff with documents discussed on the record. Order regarding motion informa pauperis to follow. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Patricia Hounsel and Scott Meyers Pro se. John McNicholas for the defendants.) (McKillop, Matthew)
August 17, 2022 Filing 9 Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #6 MOTION for Discovery with certificate of service filed by Giangrasso Law, Korde and Associates, P.C., Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mortgage, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment, #3 Exhibit C - Assessor's Card, #4 Exhibit D - Stipulation, #5 Exhibit E - BK Order)(McNicholas, John)
August 17, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John S. McNicholas on behalf of Giangrasso Law, Korde and Associates, P.C., Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing (McNicholas, John)
August 16, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2022 09:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (McKillop, Matthew)
August 16, 2022 Filing 6 EMERGENCY MOTION for Discovery by Patricia Hounsell.(Phillips, Sophie)
August 16, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 16, 2022 Filing 4 EXHIBITS by Patricia Hounsell. (Phillips, Sophie)
August 16, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Patricia Hounsell.(Phillips, Sophie)
August 16, 2022 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Patricia Hounsell.(Phillips, Sophie)
August 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Patricia Hounsell. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Phillips, Sophie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hounsell v. Crowd Lending Fund LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Hounsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowd Lending Fund LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Najarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Trust, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: John S. McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernadino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Van Dam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giangrasso Law, Korde and Associates, P.C.
Represented By: John S. McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?