Brown v. United States Postal Service
Plaintiff: Peter I Brown
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Case Number: 1:2022cv11370
Filed: August 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2022 Filing 14 Copy re 13 Notice Cancelling Hearing mailed to Peter I Brown 258 Andover Street Georgetown, MA 01833 on 10/20/2022. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
October 20, 2022 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF CANCELLING Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2022 03:30 PM before Judge Patti B. Saris until further notice. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
October 20, 2022 Filing 12 DOCKET SHEET sent to Peter I Brown 258 Andover Street Georgetown, MA 01833 (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
October 13, 2022 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States Postal Service. (Sauter, Mark)
October 13, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by United States Postal Service.(Sauter, Mark)
October 13, 2022 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment filed by United States Postal Service. (Sauter, Mark)
October 13, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment by United States Postal Service.(Sauter, Mark)
September 16, 2022 Filing 7 STATE COURT Record as to Brown v. United States Postal Service. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
August 31, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Rayford A. Farquhar (Farquhar, Rayford)
August 31, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Sauter on behalf of United States Postal Service (Sauter, Mark)
August 30, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Scheduling ConferenceThis hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2022 03:30 PM IN Boston before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
August 26, 2022 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Currie, Haley)
August 26, 2022 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
August 25, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Postal Service ( Fee Status: US Government) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form)(Farquhar, Rayford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter I Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: Mark Sauter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?