XMOD Industries et al v. Kennedy et al
Plaintiff: XMOD Industries, a California Corporation, Michael Katsell, Linus Chee and XMOD Industries
Defendant: Daniel Kennedy and MRKT LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv11464
Filed: September 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION Alternate Service of Process by Electronic Mail and Other Electronic Means by Linus Chee, Michael Katsell, XMOD Industries. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Wasserman, Matthew)
November 1, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Wasserman on behalf of Linus Chee, Michael Katsell, XMOD Industries (Wasserman, Matthew)
November 1, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebekah S. Mintzer on behalf of Linus Chee, Michael Katsell, XMOD Industries (Mintzer, Rebekah)
September 19, 2022 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Linus Chee, Michael Katsell, XMOD Industries. (Wasserman, Matthew)
September 12, 2022 Filing 7 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Matthew C. Wasserman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Kelly, Danielle)
September 12, 2022 Filing 6 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Rebekah S. Mintzer. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Kelly, Danielle)
September 12, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Daniel Kennedy, MRKT LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Phillips, Sophie)
September 12, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
September 9, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Matthew C. Wasserman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9490052 by Linus Chee, Michael Katsell, XMOD Industries, a California Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certification of Matthew C. Wasserman)(Cocheteux, Christine)
September 9, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Rebekah S. Mintzer Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9490045 by Linus Chee, Michael Katsell, XMOD Industries, a California Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certification of Rebekah S. Mintzer)(Cocheteux, Christine)
September 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9489785 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by XMOD Industries, a California Corporation, Linus Chee, Michael Katsell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Category Sheet)(Cocheteux, Christine) Modified on 9/12/2022: Corrected docket text (Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: XMOD Industries et al v. Kennedy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XMOD Industries, a California Corporation
Represented By: Christine L. Cocheteux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Katsell
Represented By: Christine L. Cocheteux
Represented By: Rebekah S. Mintzer
Represented By: Matthew C. Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linus Chee
Represented By: Christine L. Cocheteux
Represented By: Matthew C. Wasserman
Represented By: Rebekah S. Mintzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XMOD Industries
Represented By: Christine L. Cocheteux
Represented By: Matthew C. Wasserman
Represented By: Rebekah S. Mintzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRKT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?