Lloyd v. Covidien, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vibron Lloyd
Defendant: Jose E. Almeida, Bryan Hanson and Geoff Martha
Case Number: 1:2022cv11654
Filed: September 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2022 Filing 30 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. MDL Orders No. 1-3. General Provisions. (Attachments: # 1 Order Suspending Deadlines & Staying Responsive Pleadings, # 2 Order Concerning Appearances of Counsel) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
September 29, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO Number: 4, MDL No. 3029 has been transferred from Central District of Illinois and assigned civil action number: 1:22-cv-11654-PBS Lloyd v. Martha. Central District of Illinois case number: 1:21-cv-01249. In Re: Covidien Hernia Mesh Products Liability Litigation No. II, MDL 3029 (Danieli, Chris)
September 29, 2022 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris)
September 29, 2022 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Central; Case Number 1:21-cv-01249.
September 27, 2022 Filing 26 Conditional Transfer Order entered by Clerk, MDL Panel, transferring this case to the District of Massachusetts. This case is terminated. (Attachments: #1 MDL Order Lifting Stay) (JRK)
September 26, 2022 Filing 25 MDL Remark: ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CTO (CTO-4) ((1 in ILC/1:21-cv-01249, 95 in MDL No. 3029), (10 in ILC/1:21-cv-01249, 108 in MDL No. 3029), (5 in ILC/1:21-cv-01249, 99 in MDL No. 3029) ) IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay of CTO-4 is LIFTED insofar as it relates to this action.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/26/2022. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3029, ILC/1:21-cv-01249 (LH) (JRK)
September 26, 2022 MDL Remark: ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** MINUTE ORDER -- TO THE TRANSFEREE AND TRANSFEROR COURTS IN THE ASSOCIATED CASE(S): A Conditional Transfer Order was filed on 8/18/2022. Prior to the expiration of that order's 7-day stay, opposition to the Conditional Transfer Order was filed and, pursuant to Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the Conditional Transfer Order was stayed until further order of the Panel. The opposition has now been withdrawn and the stay has been lifted. This Order Lifting Stay of the Conditional Transfer Order 4 is directed to you for filing. 28 U.S.C. 1407 requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the transfer order to the clerk of the district from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/26/2022. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3029, ILC/1:21-cv-01249 (LH) (JRK)
September 1, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: The Court's internal Merit Review Deadline set on 7/7/2022 for 10/7/2022 is reset in CMECF. (JRK)
August 31, 2022 Remark: Case reopened as of 8/30/2022 pursuant to MDL ORDER #24 . (JRK)
August 30, 2022 Filing 24 MDL Remark: ORDER REINSTATING CTO-4 (re: pldg. (1 in ILC/1:21-cv-01249, 95 in MDL No. 3029) )The stay of the Panel's conditional transfer order designated as CTO-4 filed on 8/18/2022 is REINSTATED. Lloyd notice of opposition is deemed filed as of 8/30/2022.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 8/30/2022. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3029, ILC/1:21-cv-01249 (LH) (JRK)
August 29, 2022 Filing 23 Conditional Transfer Order entered by Clerk, MDL Panel, transferring this case to the District of Massachusetts. This case is terminated. (JRK)
August 29, 2022 Filing 22 MDL Remark: CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-4) - 1 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in ILC/1:21-cv-01249, 95 in MDL No. 3029) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 8/26/2022. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3029, ILC/1:21-cv-01249 (SM) (JRK)
August 29, 2022 MDL Remark: ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-4) Finalized on 8/26/22. Please see pleading (3 in ILC/1:21-cv-01249, 97 in MDL No. 3029).As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer.The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the D. Massachusetts for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 8/26/2022. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3029, ILC/1:21-cv-01249 (SM) (JRK)
July 20, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Geoff Martha on 7/20/22 by Vibron Lloyd. (Attachments: #1 cert of service)(ANW) (Main Document 21 replaced on 7/20/2022) (ANW).
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 7/8/2022. Plaintiff's Motion for Status #18 is DENIED as moot with entry of the Court's Order #19 . (KB)
July 7, 2022 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Vibron Lloyd. (KB)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 7/7/2022. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1) Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint #16 is GRANTED. Clerk is directed to docket the proposed amended complaint attached to Plaintiff's motion. 2) Defendants Almeida and Hanson are dismissed without prejudice. Clerk is directed to terminate these defendants. 3) Clerk is directed to add Geoff Martha as a defendant. Plaintiff shall serve this defendant within 90 days of this Order. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this defendant without prejudice. 4) Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank request for waiver of service form. 5) Clerk is directed to reset the Court's internal merit review deadline to 90 days from the date this Order is entered. 6) Plaintiff's Motion for Status #17 is DENIED as moot. (KB)
June 16, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION on Status regarding #16 MOTION for Leave to Renew Complaint by Plaintiff Vibron Lloyd. Responses due by 6/30/2022 (ANW)
May 19, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Status regarding #16 MOTION for Leave to File by Plaintiff Vibron Lloyd. Responses due by 6/2/2022 (ANW)
March 29, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Renew Complaint by Plaintiff Vibron Lloyd. Responses due by 4/12/2022 (RES)
February 22, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vibron Lloyd regarding #12 (ANW)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 2/16/2022. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint #14 is DENIED with leave to renew. If Plaintiff desires to amend his complaint, he must attach a copy of the proposed amended complaint to any motion seeking leave to do so. The amended complaint must include all allegations against all defendants Plaintiff wishes to sue without reference to any prior complaint. Piecemeal amendments are not permitted. (KB)
February 15, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File to Amended #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Vibron Lloyd. Responses due by 3/1/2022 (ANW)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 2/11/2022. Plaintiff filed a copy of his original complaint and notarized copies of completed waivers of service and the example form found in Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See #13 . Out of an abundance of caution, the Court docketed these materials as a motion. The motion #13 is DENIED. The Court cannot determine the relief Plaintiff seeks. If he is attempting to serve the defendants, he must send those documents directly to the defendants named in his complaint or otherwise arrange for service. Plaintiff is responsible for the costs of service and he must file proof of service within the deadlines set forth in the Court's Text Order entered January 11, 2022. Plaintiffs Motion for Waiver of Service Forms #12 is DENIED as moot. The Clerk has already sent these forms to Plaintiff. (KB)
January 26, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Vibron Lloyd. Responses due by 2/9/2022 (ANW)
January 20, 2022 Filing 12 Motion for 5 Waiver of Service Forms for 5 new Defendants (in Letter form) from Vibron Lloyd (Attachments: #1 envelope) (ANW) Modified on 1/26/2022 (KB). Modified on 1/26/2022 to change to a motion (KB).
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 1/11/2022. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1) Plaintiff shall serve the defendants within 90 days of this Order. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice. 2) Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff two blank waivers of service and a copy of Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. 3) Plaintiff's Motion for Status #9 is GRANTED. The Court addressed all pending matters in this Order. (KB)
November 24, 2021 Filing 10 Letter from Vibion Lloyd requesting Status of Case. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (ANW)
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Status by Plaintiff Vibron Lloyd. Responses due by 10/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 envelope)(ANW)
September 20, 2021 Prisoner Filing Fee received 9/20/2021, in the amount of $ 402; receipt number 44626003939 (RES)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 9/2/2021. Plaintiff has filed a Complaint but has not paid the $402 filing fee nor filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 21 days of the entry of this order, Plaintiff must pay the $402 filing fee in full or file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis with attached trust fund ledgers for the last 6 months. Failure to comply without good cause will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice, and the Plaintiff will still be responsible for payment of the filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1914. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis. (Blank IFP Motion attached) (KB)
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 322 16th Street, Rock Island, IL 61201. Merit Review Deadline set for 9/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues) (KB)
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-04400. .
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 TRANSFERRED to the Central District of Illinois at Peoria the electronic record. (aee, )
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This action is transferred forthwith to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois at Peoria for resolution of Plaintiff's filing fee issues and whatever other action the transferee court deems appropriate. The Court notes that Plaintiff has "struck out" pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) and was informed as such in a prior order of this court. See Lloyd v. Village of Maywood, Case No. 17 C 0377 (N.D. Ill.) (dismissed on March 27, 2017) (Alonso, J.) The Clerk shall not issue summonses unless the transferee court so directs. The case and any pending motions are terminated on this Court's docket. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 9/2/2021. Mailed notice (aee, )
September 2, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (aee, )
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (aee, )
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Vibron Lloyd (Exhibits). (aee, )
August 18, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (aee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lloyd v. Covidien, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vibron Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose E. Almeida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoff Martha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?