Norfolk & Dedham Mutual Fire Insurance Company as subrogor of LTI Harvard, Inc. v. Bren-Tronics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Norfolk & Dedham Mutual Fire Insurance Company as subrogor of LTI Harvard, Inc.
Defendant: Bren-Tronics, Inc. and Saft America, Inc
3Rd Party Defendant: Galley Power LLC and Galley Power, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv11669
Filed: September 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2022 Filing 30 Summons Issued as to Galley Power LLC, Galley Power, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas)
November 22, 2022 Filing 29 Galley Power, LLC's ANSWER to Third Party Complaint of Bren-Tronics, LLC by Galley Power LLC.(Esposito, Cristina)
November 22, 2022 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Galley Power LLC. (Esposito, Cristina)
November 22, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina M. Esposito on behalf of Galley Power LLC (Esposito, Cristina)
November 10, 2022 Filing 26 ANSWER to Crossclaim of Bren-Tronics, Inc. #17 by Saft America, Inc.(Michienzie, Paul)
November 8, 2022 Filing 25 Response by Bren-Tronics, Inc. to #15 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim -of SAFT AMERICA, INC., and Jury Demand. (Kim, Anne)
November 4, 2022 Filing 24 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT of Saft America, Inc. against Galley Power LLC, Galley Power, Inc., filed by Saft America, Inc.(Michienzie, Paul)
November 2, 2022 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed Galley Power LLC served on 10/31/2022, answer due 11/21/2022; Galley Power, Inc. served on 10/31/2022, answer due 11/21/2022. (Kim, Anne)
October 28, 2022 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to Galley Power LLC, Galley Power, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lima, Christine)
October 27, 2022 Filing 21 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Galley Power LLC, Galley Power, Inc., filed by Bren-Tronics, Inc..(Knipper, Christine)
October 27, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference, to be held by telephone, set for 12/7/2022 03:15 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
October 25, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Crawford Brandon on behalf of Saft America, Inc (Brandon, Adam)
October 21, 2022 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bren-Tronics, Inc.. (Knipper, Christine)
October 21, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Saft America, Inc by Bren-Tronics, Inc..(Knipper, Christine)
October 21, 2022 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Saft America, Inc. (Michienzie, Paul)
October 21, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Saft America, Inc.'s, CROSSCLAIM against Bren-Tronics. Inc. against Saft America, Inc by Saft America, Inc.(Michienzie, Paul)
October 13, 2022 Filing 14 STATE COURT Record Saft America, Inc summons served on 9/2/2022.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court paper 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court paper 2 - Civil Action Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - State Court paper 2.1 - Tracking Order, #4 Exhibit D - State Court paper 3 - Affidavit re service, #5 Exhibit E - State Court paper 3.1 - Notice re service, #6 Exhibit F - State Court paper 4 - 2d Affidavit re service, #7 Exhibit G - State Court paper 5 - Notice of filing of removal)(Bennett, Richard)
October 7, 2022 Filing 13 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit A - Complaint; Responses due by 10/21/2022 (Warnock, Douglas)
October 7, 2022 Filing 12 Joint Letter/request (non-motion) of Parties Regarding Scheduling, Deadlines, And Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing. (Murphy, Thomas) Removed document on 10/7/2022 as it was filed in error, has been refiled in appropriate case (Warnock, Douglas).
October 6, 2022 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit A - Complaint by Bren-Tronics, Inc., Saft America, Inc.(Bennett, Richard) Modified event type on 10/7/2022 (Warnock, Douglas).
October 6, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E. Bennett on behalf of Saft America, Inc (Bennett, Richard)
October 6, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine A. Knipper on behalf of Bren-Tronics, Inc. (Knipper, Christine)
October 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne V. Kim on behalf of Bren-Tronics, Inc. (Kim, Anne)
October 3, 2022 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McManus, Caetlin)
October 3, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
October 3, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Case transferred back to Eastern Division (Boston). (Danieli, Chris)
September 30, 2022 Filing 4 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 9/30/2022 Case Number 1:22-cv-11669. (Alba, Robert)
September 30, 2022 Filing 3 Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester) (Warnock, Douglas)
September 30, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Category Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, by Saft America, Inc. (Michienzie, Paul) Docket text modified on 10/3/2022 (McManus, Caetlin).
September 30, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Saft America, Inc ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9522890 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C- State Court Affidavit re Bren-Tronics service, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Affidavit re Saft service, #5 Exhibit E - State Court endorsement re service, #6 Exhibit F - State court docket sheet, #7 Civil Cover Sheet JS044)(Michienzie, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norfolk & Dedham Mutual Fire Insurance Company as subrogor of LTI Harvard, Inc. v. Bren-Tronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norfolk & Dedham Mutual Fire Insurance Company as subrogor of LTI Harvard, Inc.
Represented By: Edward A. Bopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bren-Tronics, Inc.
Represented By: Christine A. Knipper
Represented By: Anne V. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saft America, Inc
Represented By: Paul Michienzie
Represented By: Adam Crawford Brandon
Represented By: Richard E. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Galley Power LLC
Represented By: Cristina M. Esposito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Galley Power, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?