Montecalvo v. Cabela's Inc.
Plaintiff: Peter Montecalvo
Defendant: Cabela's Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv11837
Filed: October 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2022 Filing 18 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, #1 Complaint Cabela's Inc. answer due 1/6/2023. (Warnock, Douglas)
November 21, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to January 6, 2023 to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Cabela's Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1)(Remy, Emyr) Modified event type on 11/22/2022 (Warnock, Douglas).
November 18, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Kristine Tack on behalf of Peter Montecalvo (Tack, Rachel)
November 18, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Laird on behalf of Peter Montecalvo (Laird, Michael)
November 18, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C Gudmundson on behalf of Peter Montecalvo (Gudmundson, Brian)
November 18, 2022 Filing 13 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 , #11 , #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorneys Brian C. Gudmundson, Michael J. Laird, and Rachel K. Tack added. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Warnock, Douglas)
November 18, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Rachel K. Tack Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9594120 by Peter Montecalvo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel K. Tack ISO PHV Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guglielmo, Joseph)
November 18, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael J. Laird Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9594105 by Peter Montecalvo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Laird ISO PHV Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guglielmo, Joseph)
November 18, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brian C. Gudmundson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9594087 by Peter Montecalvo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian C. Gudmundson ISO PHV Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guglielmo, Joseph)
November 10, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Cabela's Inc. served on 11/4/2022, answer due 11/25/2022. (Guglielmo, Joseph)
November 1, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Samuel Binder on behalf of Peter Montecalvo (Binder, Ethan)
October 28, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Carey Alexander on behalf of Peter Montecalvo (Alexander, Carey)
October 28, 2022 Filing 6 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting ECF #4 and #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Carey Alexander & Ethan Binder. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Warnock, Douglas)
October 28, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ethan S. Binder Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9564081 by Peter Montecalvo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ethan S. Binder ISO PHV Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guglielmo, Joseph)
October 28, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Carey Alexander Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9564069 by Peter Montecalvo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carey Alexander ISO PHV Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guglielmo, Joseph)
October 28, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cabela's Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
October 28, 2022 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
October 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cabela's Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9562830 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Peter Montecalvo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Guglielmo, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montecalvo v. Cabela's Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Montecalvo
Represented By: Joseph P. Guglielmo
Represented By: Brian C Gudmundson
Represented By: Carey Alexander
Represented By: Michael J Laird
Represented By: Rachel Kristine Tack
Represented By: Ethan Samuel Binder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabela's Inc.
Represented By: Emyr T. Remy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?