Ascend Learning, LLC et al v. Bryan et al
Plaintiff: Ascend Learning, LLC and Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C.
Defendant: Bridgette Bryan and SPIN-Learning, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv11978
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Filing 20 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying #14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion denied as moot in light of the amended complaint. (Folan, Karen)
January 5, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily S. Unger on behalf of Ascend Learning, LLC, Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C. (Unger, Emily)
January 5, 2023 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against SPIN-Learning, LLC, Bridgette Bryan, filed by Ascend Learning, LLC, Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Chunias, Jennifer)
December 27, 2022 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SPIN-Learning, LLC. (DiGiampaolo, Amie)
December 27, 2022 Filing 16 DECLARATION re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Bridgette Bryan, SPIN-Learning, LLC. (DiGiampaolo, Amie)
December 27, 2022 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bridgette Bryan, SPIN-Learning, LLC. (DiGiampaolo, Amie)
December 27, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Responses due by 1/10/2023) by Bridgette Bryan, SPIN-Learning, LLC.(DiGiampaolo, Amie)
December 12, 2022 Filing 13 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/27/2022 to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Bridgette Bryan answer due 12/27/2022; SPIN-Learning, LLC answer due 12/27/2022. (McManus, Caetlin)
December 9, 2022 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/27/2022 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Bridgette Bryan, SPIN-Learning, LLC.(DiGiampaolo, Amie)
December 9, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Amie DiGiampaolo on behalf of Bridgette Bryan, SPIN-Learning, LLC (DiGiampaolo, Amie)
November 23, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed SPIN-Learning, LLC served on 11/21/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. (Chunias, Jennifer)
November 23, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Bridgette Bryan served on 11/21/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. (Chunias, Jennifer)
November 21, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Bridgette Bryan, SPIN-Learning, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
November 21, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
November 21, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan Schweers on behalf of Ascend Learning, LLC, Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C. (Schweers, Dylan)
November 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E. Tully on behalf of Ascend Learning, LLC, Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C. (Tully, Mark)
November 21, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Chunias on behalf of Ascend Learning, LLC, Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C. (Chunias, Jennifer)
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Ascend Learning, LLC for Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C... (Chunias, Jennifer)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ascend Learning, LLC. (Chunias, Jennifer)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SPIN-Learning, LLC, Bridgette Bryan Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9596095 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Ascend Learning, LLC, Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Chunias, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ascend Learning, LLC et al v. Bryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ascend Learning, LLC
Represented By: Dylan Schweers
Represented By: Jennifer L. Chunias
Represented By: Mark E. Tully
Represented By: Emily S. Unger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C.
Represented By: Dylan Schweers
Represented By: Jennifer L. Chunias
Represented By: Mark E. Tully
Represented By: Emily S. Unger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgette Bryan
Represented By: Amie DiGiampaolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPIN-Learning, LLC
Represented By: Amie DiGiampaolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?