Brooks & DeRensis, P.C. v Twin Cities Fire Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Brooks & DeRensis, P.C.
Defendant: Twin Cities Fire Insurance Co.
Case Number: 1:2022cv11980
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2023 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to January 31, 2023 to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Twin Cities Fire Insurance Co. answer due 1/31/2023. (Thomson, Katherine)
December 30, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Bergeron on behalf of Twin Cities Fire Insurance Co. (Bergeron, Thomas)
December 30, 2022 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 31, 2023 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Twin Cities Fire Insurance Co..(Flanagan, Christopher)
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Twin Cities Fire Insurance Co.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Twin Cities Fire Insurance Co. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9596944 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Brooks & DeRensis, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brooks, Steven) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/7/2022 to correct PDF document view ) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks & DeRensis, P.C. v Twin Cities Fire Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooks & DeRensis, P.C.
Represented By: James T. Hargrove
Represented By: Steven J. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Cities Fire Insurance Co.
Represented By: Christopher P. Flanagan
Represented By: Thomas M. Bergeron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?