Canada v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Plaintiff: Christine Canada
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America and New York Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv12080
Filed: December 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2023 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Finn, Mary)
January 6, 2023 Filing 11 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Feigenbaum, Jonathan)
January 6, 2023 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File (Dumoulin, Rose)
January 5, 2023 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 24, 2023 to File a Responsive Pleading by Life Insurance Company of North America, New York Life Insurance Company.(Parsons, Katherine)
January 5, 2023 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Parsons, Katherine)
January 5, 2023 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by New York Life Insurance Company. (Parsons, Katherine)
January 5, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine R. Parsons on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America, New York Life Insurance Company (Parsons, Katherine)
December 27, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Christine Canada. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023. Acknowledgement filed by Christine Canada. (Feigenbaum, Jonathan)
December 27, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Christine Canada. New York Life Insurance Company served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023. Acknowledgement filed by Christine Canada. (Feigenbaum, Jonathan)
December 8, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America, New York Life Insurance Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
December 8, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
December 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9620043 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Christine Canada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 2006 Market Conduct Study California, #2 Exhibit B 2012 Market Conduct Study California, #3 Exhibit C 2013 Multistate Market Conduct Study, #4 Exhibit D Affidavit of Paul Nowak VP of New York Life, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Category Form)(Feigenbaum, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canada v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Canada
Represented By: Jonathan M. Feigenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Katherine R. Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Katherine R. Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?