24-7 Bright Star Healthcare, LLC v. Bright Star Caregivers LLC
Plaintiff: 24-7 Bright Star Healthcare, LLC
Defendant: Bright Star Caregivers LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv12195
Filed: December 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 24-7 Bright Star Healthcare, LLC (Ishmael, Safraz)
January 3, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by 24-7 Bright Star Healthcare, LLC. Bright Star Caregivers LLC served on 12/28/2022, answer due 1/18/2023. Acknowledgement filed by 24-7 Bright Star Healthcare, LLC. (Ishmael, Safraz)
December 23, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bright Star Caregivers LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
December 23, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
December 23, 2022 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Ishmael, Safraz)
December 23, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 24-7 Bright Star Healthcare, LLC identifying Corporate Parent BrightStar Group Holdings, Inc. for 24-7 Bright Star Healthcare, LLC.. (Ishmael, Safraz)
December 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bright Star Caregivers LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9643723 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by 24-7 Bright Star Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Ishmael, Safraz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 24-7 Bright Star Healthcare, LLC v. Bright Star Caregivers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 24-7 Bright Star Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Safraz W. Ishmael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bright Star Caregivers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?