Carp et al v. United Cultivation, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Douglas Carp and Robert Carp
Defendant: United Cultivation, LLC, Blue and Yellow Holdings, LLC, Michael Spengler, Carolyn Spengler, Steven Phaneuf, Danielle Phaneuf, Kerstin Phaneuf and Neil Phaneuf, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2022cv12202
Filed: December 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2023 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion To Dismiss The Complaint, Or, In The Alternative, Motion For A More Definite Statement filed by Robert Carp. (Currie, Haley)
January 24, 2023 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion To Dismiss The Complaint, Or, In The Alternative, Motion For A More Definite Statement filed by United Cultivation, LLC. (Lu, Tony)
January 24, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion To Dismiss The Complaint, Or, In The Alternative, Motion For A More Definite Statement by United Cultivation, LLC.(Lu, Tony)
January 23, 2023 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Blue and Yellow Holdings, LLC, Danielle Phaneuf, Kerstin Phaneuf, Neil Phaneuf, Jr, Steven Phaneuf, Carolyn Spengler, Michael Spengler. (Lu, Tony)
January 23, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Tony K. Lu on behalf of Blue and Yellow Holdings, LLC, Danielle Phaneuf, Kerstin Phaneuf, Neil Phaneuf, Jr, Steven Phaneuf, Carolyn Spengler, Michael Spengler, United Cultivation, LLC (Lu, Tony)
January 3, 2023 Filing 5 Filing fee/payment: $ 402.00, receipt number 100001595 for #1 Complaint, (Phillips, Sophie)
December 27, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Blue and Yellow Holdings, LLC, Danielle Phaneuf, Kerstin Phaneuf, Neil Phaneuf, Jr, Steven Phaneuf, Carolyn Spengler, Michael Spengler, United Cultivation, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McManus, Caetlin)
December 27, 2022 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
December 27, 2022 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case. (McManus, Caetlin)
December 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carolyn Spengler, United Cultivation, LLC, Steven Phaneuf, Kerstin Phaneuf, Danielle Phaneuf, Blue and Yellow Holdings, LLC, Neil Phaneuf, Jr, Michael Spengler, filed by Douglas Carp, Robert Carp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(McManus, Caetlin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carp et al v. United Cultivation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Carp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Carp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Cultivation, LLC
Represented By: Tony K. Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue and Yellow Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Tony K. Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Spengler
Represented By: Tony K. Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Spengler
Represented By: Tony K. Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Phaneuf
Represented By: Tony K. Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Phaneuf
Represented By: Tony K. Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerstin Phaneuf
Represented By: Tony K. Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Phaneuf, Jr.
Represented By: Tony K. Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?