Donovan et al v. BP Electric, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael P. Donovan and Lawrence J. Bradley
Defendant: BP Electric, LLC
Trustee: Eastern Bank
Case Number: 1:2022cv12220
Filed: December 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Michael P. Donovan. BP Electric, LLC served on 1/24/2023, answer due 2/14/2023. Acknowledgement filed by Michael P. Donovan. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A Email with Relay Receipt)(Shea, Kathryn)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered re #5 MOTION for Order to Allow Service by Alternate Means by Michael P. Donovan.In light of the supplemental information provided by Plaintiff coupled with the original submission, the Court finds the Plaintiff has established the basis under the Rules for service by email applying the law explained by Judge Burroughs in her electronic order cited in Plaintiff's papers. (Belmont, Kellyann)
January 10, 2023 Filing 7 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Order to Allow Service by Alternate Means filed by Michael P. Donovan. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Email from Defendant)(Shea, Kathryn)
January 10, 2023 Filing 6 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. re #5 MOTION for Order to Allow Service by Alternate Means. Counsel shall supplement the motion to explain the apparent difference between the read receipt submitted in 22cv10989, Doc. No. 5-2 with the read receipt submitted in this case, Doc. No. 5-2. (Dore, Samantha)
January 9, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Order to Allow Service by Alternate Means by Michael P. Donovan. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Secretary of State website page, #2 Ex. B - Email to Defendant with Delivery Receipt, #3 Ex. C - Proposed Order)(Shea, Kathryn)
January 9, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Michael P. Donovan as to BP Electric, LLC. (Shea, Kathryn)
December 29, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BP Electric, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
December 29, 2022 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Danieli, Chris)
December 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BP Electric, LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number BMADC-9646790 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Michael P. Donovan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Action and Category Sheets, #2 Ex. A - Letter of Assent, #3 Ex. B - CBA, #4 Ex. C - Demand Letter)(Shea, Kathryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donovan et al v. BP Electric, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael P. Donovan
Represented By: Kathryn S. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence J. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Electric, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Eastern Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?