Umicore Precious Metals Chemistry USA, LLC et al v. Trustees of Boston College
Plaintiff: Umicore Precious Metals Chemistry USA, LLC and Umicore AG & Co. KG
Defendant: Trustees of Boston College
Case Number: 1:2022cv12232
Filed: December 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2023 Filing 9 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #4 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint, and Exhibits A, H, J-L. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
January 3, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John Custer on behalf of Umicore AG & Co. KG, Umicore Precious Metals Chemistry USA, LLC (Custer, John)
December 30, 2022 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Umicore AG & Co. KG, Umicore Precious Metals Chemistry USA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Umicore USA Inc., Corporate Parent Umicore NV/SA for Umicore Precious Metals Chemistry USA, LLC; Corporate Parent Umicore NV/SA for Umicore AG & Co. KG.. (Rodrigues, Ruben)
December 30, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Trustees of Boston College. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Dore, Samantha)
December 30, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
December 30, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint,, and Exhibits A, H, J-L by Umicore AG & Co. KG, Umicore Precious Metals Chemistry USA, LLC.(Rodrigues, Ruben)
December 30, 2022 Filing 3 Entry Made In Error (Dore, Samantha)
December 30, 2022 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Rodrigues, Ruben)
December 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against Trustees of Boston College Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9648430 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Umicore AG & Co. KG, Umicore Precious Metals Chemistry USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Category Form)(Rodrigues, Ruben) Modified on 12/30/2022: Updated docket text. (Dore, Samantha). (Attachment 1, 8, 10, 11, 12 replaced on 1/19/2023. (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2023: #15 *SEALED* Unredacted Complaint) (de Oliveira, Flaviana).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Umicore Precious Metals Chemistry USA, LLC et al v. Trustees of Boston College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Umicore Precious Metals Chemistry USA, LLC
Represented By: Ruben J. Rodrigues
Represented By: John Custer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Umicore AG & Co. KG
Represented By: Ruben J. Rodrigues
Represented By: John Custer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of Boston College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?