Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute v. Etsy, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute
Defendant: Etsy, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv12242
Filed: December 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2023 Filing 31 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Kaler, Robert)
January 20, 2023 Filing 30 Second AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of Dr. Martin Bide, Ph.D filed by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Kaler, Robert)
January 20, 2023 Filing 29 Second AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of James Coleman filed by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Kaler, Robert)
January 20, 2023 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Kaler, Robert)
January 17, 2023 Filing 27 DECLARATION re #25 Opposition to Motion (Declaration of Andrew Stewart in Support of Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction) by Etsy, Inc.. (Gershenson, Adam)
January 17, 2023 Filing 26 DECLARATION re #25 Opposition to Motion (Declaration of Jennifer Kelly in Support of Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction) by Etsy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Gershenson, Adam)
January 17, 2023 Filing 25 Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Etsy, Inc.. (Gershenson, Adam)
January 10, 2023 Filing 24 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. re #14 Stipulation, filed by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute, (Hearing set for 1/25/2023 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 (In person only) before Judge Rya W. Zobel.)(Urso, Lisa)
January 9, 2023 Filing 23 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Charles Low. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Warnock, Douglas)
January 9, 2023 Filing 22 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael G. Rhodes. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Warnock, Douglas)
January 9, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Celene Chen on behalf of Etsy, Inc. (Chen, Celene)
January 9, 2023 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Etsy, Inc.. (Gershenson, Adam)
January 9, 2023 Filing 19 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Charles H. Low Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9658830 by Etsy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Certification of Charles H. Low))(Gershenson, Adam)
January 9, 2023 Filing 18 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael G. Rhodes Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9658826 by Etsy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Certification of Michael G. Rhodes))(Gershenson, Adam)
January 9, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S. Gershenson on behalf of Etsy, Inc. (Gershenson, Adam)
January 5, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute served on 1/4/2023, answer due 1/25/2023. (Kaler, Robert)
January 5, 2023 Filing 15 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Kaler, Robert)
January 5, 2023 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Stipulated Request for Scheduling Order on Plaintiff's Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Kaler, Robert)
January 4, 2023 Filing 13 Notice of Service of Process filed by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. Individual(s)/Entities served: Etsy, Inc.. (Kaler, Robert)
January 4, 2023 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. Etsy, Inc. served on 1/4/2023, answer due 1/25/2023. Acknowledgement filed by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Kaler, Robert)
January 3, 2023 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Etsy, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Phillips, Sophie)
January 3, 2023 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Finn, Mary)
January 3, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Report on Filing or Determination Re: Patent or Trademark AO 120. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms/Local Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Report on the filing of patent/trademark case. (Phillips, Sophie)
December 30, 2022 Filing 8 Amended MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [CORRECT VERSION] filed by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Kaler, Robert)
December 30, 2022 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Kaler, Robert)
December 30, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of James Coleman in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Kaler, Robert)
December 30, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Dr. Martin Bide, Ph.D in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kaler, Robert)
December 30, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Karl Spilhaus in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Kaler, Robert)
December 30, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute.(Kaler, Robert)
December 30, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Kaler, Robert)
December 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Plaintiff Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute against Etsy, Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9648977 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #8 Category Form Category Form)(Kaler, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute v. Etsy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute
Represented By: Robert J. Kaler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etsy, Inc.
Represented By: Adam S. Gershenson
Represented By: Michael G. Rhodes
Represented By: Celene Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?