FourWorld Event Opportunities, LP et al
Petitioner: FourWorld Event Opportunities, LP and Genesis Emerging Markets Investment Company
Respondent: Bain & Company Inc. and Bain & Company China, Inc.
Interested Party: 58.com, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022mc91099
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1782 Letter rogatory - appointment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2022 Filing 44 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #2 MOTION for Discovery MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1782 TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY FOR USE IN A FOREIGN PROCEEDING filed by Bain & Company China, Inc., Bain & Company Inc.. (Knowles, Matthew)
April 29, 2022 Filing 43 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #42 Assented to Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to the § 1782 Application; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Kelly, Danielle)
April 25, 2022 Filing 42 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Sur Reply in Opposition to the 1782 Application by Bain & Company China, Inc., Bain & Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BAINS [PROPOSED] SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO THE 1782 APPLICATION)(Knowles, Matthew)
April 22, 2022 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to #2 MOTION for Discovery MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1782 TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY FOR USE IN A FOREIGN PROCEEDING filed by FourWorld Event Opportunities, LP, Genesis Emerging Markets Investment Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Declaration of Duane L. Loft, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Riden, Stephen)
April 21, 2022 Filing 40 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #39 Assented to Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Application for Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 to Conduct Discovery for Use in a Foreign Proceeding; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Kelly, Danielle)
April 20, 2022 Filing 39 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Application for Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 to Conduct Discovery for Use in a Foreign Proceeding by FourWorld Event Opportunities, LP, Genesis Emerging Markets Investment Company.(Riden, Stephen)
April 13, 2022 Filing 38 ADDENDUM re #2 MOTION for Discovery MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1782 TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY FOR USE IN A FOREIGN PROCEEDING, #36 Cross MOTION for Protective Order (Eratta Notice) filed by Bain & Company China, Inc., Bain & Company Inc.. (Knowles, Matthew)
April 11, 2022 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Discovery MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1782 TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY FOR USE IN A FOREIGN PROCEEDING and in Support re #36 Cross MOTION for Protective Order filed by Bain & Company China, Inc., Bain & Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Graham Rose, #3 Declaration of Kelli Soucy)(Rodriguez, Annabel)
April 11, 2022 Filing 36 Cross MOTION for Protective Order by Bain & Company China, Inc., Bain & Company Inc..(Rodriguez, Annabel)
April 7, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by James Brown on behalf of 58.com, Inc. (Brown, James)
April 7, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy G. Nelson on behalf of 58.com, Inc. (Nelson, Timothy)
April 6, 2022 Filing 33 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Timothy G. Nelson and James W. Brown. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Kelly, Danielle)
April 6, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Ira A. Schochet on behalf of FourWorld Event Opportunities, LP, Genesis Emerging Markets Investment Company (Schochet, Ira)
April 6, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine M. Mackintosh on behalf of FourWorld Event Opportunities, LP, Genesis Emerging Markets Investment Company (Mackintosh, Christine)
April 6, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Timothy G. Nelson and James W. Brown Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number AMADC-9261809 by 58.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certification Of Timothy G. Nelson, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certification Of James W. Brown)(Anim, Yaw)
April 5, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by William James Harvey on behalf of FourWorld Event Opportunities, LP, Genesis Emerging Markets Investment Company (Harvey, William)
April 5, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Duane L. Loft on behalf of FourWorld Event Opportunities, LP, Genesis Emerging Markets Investment Company (Loft, Duane)
April 5, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Brianna S. Hills on behalf of FourWorld Event Opportunities, LP, Genesis Emerging Markets Investment Company (Hills, Brianna)
April 5, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy L. Neuhardt on behalf of FourWorld Event Opportunities, LP, Genesis Emerging Markets Investment Company (Neuhardt, Amy)
April 5, 2022 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FourWorld Event Opportunities, LP. (Riden, Stephen)
April 5, 2022 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Genesis Emerging Markets Investment Company. (Riden, Stephen)
April 4, 2022 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION for Discovery MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1782 TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY FOR USE IN A FOREIGN PROCEEDING filed by 58.com, Inc.. (Anim, Yaw)
April 4, 2022 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 58.com, Inc.. (Anim, Yaw)
April 4, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Yaw Anim on behalf of 58.com, Inc. (Anim, Yaw)
April 4, 2022 Filing 20 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #18 Assented to Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Duane L. Loft, Amy L. Neuhardt, Brianna S. Hills and William J. Harvey. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Kelly, Danielle)
April 4, 2022 Filing 19 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #17 Assented to Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Christine Mackintosh & Ira A. Schochet. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Kelly, Danielle)
April 1, 2022 Filing 18 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Duane L. Loft, Amy L. Neuhardt, Brianna S. Hills and William J. Harvey Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number AMADC-9255320 by FourWorld Event Opportunities, LP, Genesis Emerging Markets Investment Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Riden, Stephen)
April 1, 2022 Filing 17 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christine Mackintosh & Ira A. Schochet Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number AMADC-9255314 by FourWorld Event Opportunities, LP, Genesis Emerging Markets Investment Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Riden, Stephen)
April 1, 2022 Filing 16 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to April 11, 2022 to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint. (Kelly, Danielle)
March 31, 2022 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bain & Company Inc.. (Knowles, Matthew)
March 31, 2022 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bain & Company China, Inc.. (Knowles, Matthew)
March 30, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Annabel Rodriguez on behalf of Bain & Company China, Inc., Bain & Company Inc. (Rodriguez, Annabel)
March 30, 2022 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 11, 2022 to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, by Bain & Company China, Inc., Bain & Company Inc..(Knowles, Matthew) Modified on 3/30/2022: corrected event type (Kelly, Danielle).
March 30, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L. Knowles on behalf of Bain & Company China, Inc. (Knowles, Matthew)
March 28, 2022 Filing 10 Notice of Service of Process filed by FourWorld Event Opportunities, LP, Genesis Emerging Markets Investment Company. Individual(s)/Entities served: Bain & Company China, Inc.; Bain & Company, Inc.; 58.com. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1, #2 Affidavit Exhibit 2, #3 Affidavit Exhibit 3)(Riden, Stephen)
March 25, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L. Knowles on behalf of Bain & Company Inc. (Knowles, Matthew)
March 18, 2022 Filing 8 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1782. See attached. (Dore, Samantha) (Main Document 8 replaced on 3/21/2022) (Kelly, Danielle).
March 7, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
March 7, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Case copied over from civil action 1:21-cv-10344. All future filing to be made in this MBD 1:22-mc-91099 (Danieli, Chris)
March 4, 2022 Filing 5 DECLARATION re #1 Complaint,, JUSTICE INGRID MANGATAL by FourWorld Event Opportunities, LP, Genesis Emerging Markets Investment Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9)(Riden, Stephen)
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 DECLARATION re #1 Complaint,, MARC KISH by FourWorld Event Opportunities, LP, Genesis Emerging Markets Investment Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Riden, Stephen)
March 4, 2022 Filing 3 DECLARATION re #1 Complaint,, DUANE L. LOFT by FourWorld Event Opportunities, LP, Genesis Emerging Markets Investment Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10)(Riden, Stephen)
March 4, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Discovery MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1782 TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY FOR USE IN A FOREIGN PROCEEDING by FourWorld Event Opportunities, LP, Genesis Emerging Markets Investment Company.(Riden, Stephen)
March 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1782 TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY FOR USE IN A FOREIGN PROCEEDING by against FourWorld Event Opportunities, LP, Genesis Emerging Markets Investment Company Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9212394 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by FourWorld Event Opportunities, LP, Genesis Emerging Markets Investment Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 JS45 Category Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Riden, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FourWorld Event Opportunities, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FourWorld Event Opportunities, LP
Represented By: Stephen D. Riden
Represented By: Christine M. Mackintosh
Represented By: Amy L. Neuhardt
Represented By: Brianna S. Hills
Represented By: Duane L. Loft
Represented By: Ira A. Schochet
Represented By: William James Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Genesis Emerging Markets Investment Company
Represented By: Stephen D. Riden
Represented By: Christine M. Mackintosh
Represented By: Amy L. Neuhardt
Represented By: Brianna S. Hills
Represented By: Duane L. Loft
Represented By: Ira A. Schochet
Represented By: William James Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bain & Company Inc.
Represented By: Annabel Rodriguez
Represented By: Matthew L. Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bain & Company China, Inc.
Represented By: Annabel Rodriguez
Represented By: Matthew L. Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: 58.com, Inc.
Represented By: James Brown
Represented By: Timothy G. Nelson
Represented By: Yaw Anim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?