Buehler v. American Airlines Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dianne Buehler
Defendant: American Airlines Group Inc. and JetBlue Airways Corporation
Case Number: 1:2023cv10281
Filed: February 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1337 Sherman-Clayton Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2023 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Under the First-to-File Rule or 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Dianne Buehler. (Groopman, Steven)
March 16, 2023 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Under the First-to-File Rule or 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by American Airlines Group Inc., JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Sullivan, Marguerite)
March 16, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Under the First-to-File Rule or 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by American Airlines Group Inc., JetBlue Airways Corporation.(Sullivan, Marguerite)
March 15, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Hauser on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation (Hauser, Brian)
March 15, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard F. Schwed on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation (Schwed, Richard)
March 15, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica K Delbaum on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation (Delbaum, Jessica)
March 15, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L. Craner on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation (Craner, Matthew)
March 15, 2023 Filing 17 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Marguerite M. Sullivan, Allyson M. Maltas, and Seung Wan Paik. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Dore, Samantha)
March 15, 2023 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Marguerite M. Sullivan, Allyson M. Maltas, and Seung Wan Paik Filing fee: $ 375, receipt number AMADC-9762478 by American Airlines Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Marguerite M. Sullivan, #2 Certification of Allyson M. Maltas, #3 Certification of Seung Wan Paik)(Tolley, David)
March 15, 2023 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (MacKinlay, Glenn)
March 15, 2023 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Airlines Group Inc.. (Tolley, David)
March 15, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Tolley on behalf of American Airlines Group Inc. (Tolley, David)
March 15, 2023 Filing 12 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Matthew L. Craner, Jessica K. Delbaum, Richard Schwed, and Brian Hauser. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Dore, Samantha)
March 14, 2023 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Matthew L. Craner, Jessica K. Delbaum, Richard Schwed, and Brian Hauser Filing fee: $ 500, receipt number AMADC-9760638 by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(MacKinlay, Glenn)
March 14, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn A. MacKinlay on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation (MacKinlay, Glenn)
March 13, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dianne Buehler. JetBlue Airways Corporation waiver sent on 2/7/2023, answer due 4/10/2023. (LaSalle, Kristie)
March 13, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dianne Buehler. American Airlines Group Inc. waiver sent on 2/7/2023, answer due 4/10/2023. (LaSalle, Kristie)
February 6, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Louise Gregg on behalf of Dianne Buehler (Gregg, Christina)
February 6, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristie A. LaSalle on behalf of Dianne Buehler (LaSalle, Kristie)
February 6, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen M. Donovan-Maher on behalf of Dianne Buehler (Donovan-Maher, Kathleen)
February 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd A Seaver on behalf of Dianne Buehler (Seaver, Todd)
February 3, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to American Airlines Group Inc., JetBlue Airways Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 3, 2023 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
February 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JetBlue Airways Corporation, American Airlines Group Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9701625 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Dianne Buehler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Groopman, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buehler v. American Airlines Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Buehler
Represented By: Steven Lev Groopman
Represented By: Christina Louise Gregg
Represented By: Kathleen M. Donovan-Maher
Represented By: Kristie A. LaSalle
Represented By: Todd A Seaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Group Inc.
Represented By: Allyson M. Maltas
Represented By: Marguerite M. Sullivan
Represented By: Seung Wan Paik
Represented By: David C. Tolley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Represented By: Brian Hauser
Represented By: Jessica K Delbaum
Represented By: Matthew L. Craner
Represented By: Richard F. Schwed
Represented By: Glenn A. MacKinlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?