Whaleco Inc. v. Shein US Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Whaleco Inc.
Defendant: Shein US Services, LLC, Shein Distribution Corporation and Roadget Business Pte. Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2023cv11596
Filed: July 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Peter Waldron, Jr on behalf of Whaleco Inc. (Waldron, Jeffrey)
September 11, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Rodriguez on behalf of Whaleco Inc. (Rodriguez, Sean)
September 11, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Korologos on behalf of Whaleco Inc. (Korologos, Philip)
September 7, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Denvir, III on behalf of Whaleco Inc. (Denvir, James)
September 6, 2023 Filing 32 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting D. #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Philip C. Korologos; D. #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sean P. Rodriguez; D. #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jeffrey Waldron; D. #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Luke Williams. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorneys. (Currie, Haley)
September 6, 2023 Filing 31 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added James P. Denvir. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Currie, Haley)
August 31, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Teruya on behalf of Roadget Business Pte. Ltd., Shein Distribution Corporation, Shein US Services, LLC (Teruya, Kevin)
August 31, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Ernest Williams on behalf of Roadget Business Pte. Ltd., Shein Distribution Corporation, Shein US Services, LLC (Williams, Michael)
August 31, 2023 Filing 28 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting D. #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael E. Williams; D. #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kevin Teruya. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorneys. (Currie, Haley)
August 28, 2023 Filing 27 DECLARATION re #26 Request for Judicial Notice, by Roadget Business Pte. Ltd., Shein Distribution Corporation, Shein US Services, LLC. (Foster, Immanuel)
August 28, 2023 Filing 26 Request for Judicial Notice by Roadget Business Pte. Ltd., Shein Distribution Corporation, Shein US Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Wolkoff, Harvey)
August 28, 2023 Filing 25 DECLARATION re #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Roadget Business Pte. Ltd., Shein Distribution Corporation, Shein US Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wolkoff, Harvey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2023: #4 UNREDACTED Exhibit A) (Currie, Haley).
August 28, 2023 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Roadget Business Pte. Ltd., Shein Distribution Corporation, Shein US Services, LLC. (Wolkoff, Harvey)
August 28, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Roadget Business Pte. Ltd., Shein Distribution Corporation, Shein US Services, LLC.(Wolkoff, Harvey)
August 28, 2023 Filing 22 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) (Currie, Haley)
August 25, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) by Roadget Business Pte. Ltd., Shein Distribution Corporation, Shein US Services, LLC.(Wolkoff, Harvey)
August 23, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Luke Williams Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10004188 by Whaleco Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Luke Williams In Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Haber, Edward)
August 23, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jeffrey Waldron Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10004184 by Whaleco Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Waldron in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Haber, Edward)
August 23, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sean P. Rodriguez Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10004174 by Whaleco Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean Rodriguez in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Haber, Edward)
August 23, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Philip C. Korologos Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10004165 by Whaleco Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Philip Korologos in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Haber, Edward)
August 23, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James P. Denvir Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10004126 by Whaleco Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of James Denvir in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Haber, Edward)
August 17, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kevin Teruya Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9997567 by Roadget Business Pte. Ltd., Shein Distribution Corporation, Shein US Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Wolkoff, Harvey)
August 17, 2023 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Whaleco Inc. identifying Corporate Parent PDD Holdings, Inc. (NASDAQ: PDD) for Whaleco Inc... (Haber, Edward)
August 17, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael E. Williams Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9997511 by Roadget Business Pte. Ltd., Shein Distribution Corporation, Shein US Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Wolkoff, Harvey)
August 17, 2023 Filing 12 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time and to exceed page limit. Defendants' memorandum in support of their motion to dismiss shall not exceed twenty-five (25) pages in length and shall be filed with the Court on or before August 28, 2023; Plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss shall not exceed twenty-five (25) pages in length and shall be filed with the Court on or before September 29, 2023. (Hourihan, Lisa)
August 16, 2023 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to August 28, 2023 to File Motion to Dismiss and Leave to File in Excess of Twenty Pages by Roadget Business Pte. Ltd., Shein Distribution Corporation, Shein US Services, LLC.(Wolkoff, Harvey)
August 16, 2023 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Roadget Business Pte. Ltd., Shein Distribution Corporation, Shein US Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. for Shein Distribution Corporation, Shein US Services, LLC.. (Wolkoff, Harvey)
August 16, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Immanuel Foster on behalf of Roadget Business Pte. Ltd., Shein Distribution Corporation, Shein US Services, LLC (Foster, Immanuel)
August 16, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Zi Chun Wang on behalf of Roadget Business Pte. Ltd., Shein Distribution Corporation, Shein US Services, LLC (Wang, Zi Chun)
August 16, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Harvey J. Wolkoff on behalf of Roadget Business Pte. Ltd., Shein Distribution Corporation, Shein US Services, LLC (Wolkoff, Harvey)
August 3, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Whaleco Inc.. Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. served on 8/1/2023, answer due 8/22/2023. Acknowledgement filed by Whaleco Inc.. (Haber, Edward)
August 3, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Whaleco Inc.. Shein Distribution Corporation served on 7/31/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. Acknowledgement filed by Whaleco Inc.. (Haber, Edward)
August 3, 2023 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Whaleco Inc.. Shein US Services, LLC served on 7/31/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. Acknowledgement filed by Whaleco Inc.. (Haber, Edward)
July 17, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
July 17, 2023 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Phillips, Sophie)
July 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9948227 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Whaleco Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Haber, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whaleco Inc. v. Shein US Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whaleco Inc.
Represented By: Edward F. Haber
Represented By: James P. Denvir, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Peter Waldron, Jr
Represented By: Philip Korologos
Represented By: Sean Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shein US Services, LLC
Represented By: Harvey J. Wolkoff
Represented By: Immanuel Foster
Represented By: Kevin Teruya
Represented By: Michael Ernest Williams
Represented By: Zi Chun Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shein Distribution Corporation
Represented By: Harvey J. Wolkoff
Represented By: Immanuel Foster
Represented By: Kevin Teruya
Represented By: Michael Ernest Williams
Represented By: Zi Chun Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roadget Business Pte. Ltd.
Represented By: Harvey J. Wolkoff
Represented By: Immanuel Foster
Represented By: Kevin Teruya
Represented By: Michael Ernest Williams
Represented By: Zi Chun Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?