Sullivan
Plaintiff: James R Sullivan
Case Number: 1:2024cv10121
Filed: January 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2024 Filing 9 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER APPROVING APPRAISER'S REPORT OF VALUE. (Kelly, Danielle)
January 29, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Order to Approving Appraiser's Report of Value by James R Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order)(Muzyka, Thomas)
January 29, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE by James R Sullivan Submission of Appraisal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appraiser's Report)(Muzyka, Thomas)
January 24, 2024 Filing 6 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER TO APPRAISE. (Kelly, Danielle)
January 18, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Bromley on behalf of James R Sullivan (Bromley, John)
January 16, 2024 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Cook, Savannah)
January 16, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10220305 Fee status: Filing Fee paid), filed by James R Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Muzyka, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R Sullivan
Represented By: Thomas J Muzyka
Represented By: John J. Bromley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?