St. John v. Campbell
Petitioner: Sandra Natasha St. John
Respondent: Andrea Joy Campbell
Case Number: 1:2024cv10646
Filed: March 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE by Andrea Joy Campbell regarding existence of victims (Johnston, Tara)
May 9, 2024 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrea Joy Campbell. (Johnston, Tara)
May 9, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Andrea Joy Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Comm. v. St. John - 2012 Massachusetts Appeals Court decision, #2 Massachusetts Appeals Court Docket 2011-P-1123, #3 Massachusetts Supreme Judicial Court Docket FAR-20931, #4 Department of Correction Admission/Movement History report)(Johnston, Tara)
April 17, 2024 Filing 9 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER denying without prejudice Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #8 . Petitioner states that she is unable to pay the docket fees, see [8-1] at 5, but the filing fee has already been paid, see #1 . (Kelly, Danielle)
April 10, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sandra Natasha St. John.(Ugolini, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2024: #1 Exhibit) (Kelly, Danielle). (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/12/2024) (Kelly, Danielle). Modified on 4/12/2024: removed exhibit from main document to properly file as an attachment (Kelly, Danielle).
April 3, 2024 Filing 7 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER allowing #6 Motion for Extension of Time to May 20, 2024 to File Answer. (Kelly, Danielle)
April 1, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to May 20, 2024 to File Answer by Andrea Joy Campbell.(Johnston, Tara)
April 1, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Lyn Johnston on behalf of Andrea Joy Campbell (Johnston, Tara)
March 15, 2024 Filing 4 Copy re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), #3 Service Order - 2254 Petition, mailed to Attorney General on 3/15/2024. (Dore, Samantha)
March 15, 2024 Filing 3 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2254 Petition. Order entered pursuant to R.4 of the Rules governing Section 2254 cases for service on respondents. Answer/responsive pleading due w/in 21 days of receipt of this order. (Dore, Samantha)
March 15, 2024 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Horvath, Courtney)
March 15, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number AMADC-10318931 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Sandra Natasha St. John. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit Petitioner's exhibits 1-14, #4 Exhibit Petitioner's exhibits 15-26)(Ugolini, Michael) Modified on 3/15/2024: Updated docket text. (Dore, Samantha).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. John v. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sandra Natasha St. John
Represented By: Michael A. Ugolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrea Joy Campbell
Represented By: Tara Lyn Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?