Newman v. America Multi-Cinema, Inc.
Plaintiff: Melanie Newman
Defendant: America Multi-Cinema, Inc. doing business as AMC Theaters
Case Number: 1:2024cv11359
Filed: May 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2024 Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of Kansas; Case Number 2:23-cv-02358.
May 22, 2024 Filing 28 TRANSFER ORDER. Case electronically transferred to the District of Massachusetts (MDL 3083). Signed by deputy clerk on 05/22/2024. (gw)
January 10, 2024 Filing 27 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant America Multi-Cinema, Inc. re: #20 Motion to Compel Arbitration Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration (Gadberry, Anna)
December 21, 2023 Filing 26 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Melanie Newman re #20 Motion to Compel Arbitration (Brady, Maureen)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to #20 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Plaintiff's response is due 12/22/2023 and defendant's reply is due 1/11/2024. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 12/14/2023. (mam)
December 12, 2023 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(jrh)
December 11, 2023 Filing 24 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #20 Motion to Compel Arbitration by Plaintiff Melanie Newman. (Brady, Maureen)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting (ECF No. 22) Joint Motion to Stay Scheduling Order Deadlines. The Court grants the motion and suspends all deadlines in the #11 initial order regarding planning and scheduling and the order (ECF No. 17) modifying those deadlines, including the December 13, 2023 scheduling conference. The Court additionally finds good cause to delay the issuance of a scheduling order. If the motion to compel arbitration is denied, within fourteen calendar days after that denial, the parties are directed to submit a proposed scheduling order and their initial disclosures consistent with the process outlined in the #11 initial order regarding planning and scheduling. The Court thereafter will reset the scheduling conference and other deadlines, as appropriate. This order does not suspend or otherwise modify any deadlines related to the #20 motion to compel arbitration or any deadlines related to the Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action, which was filed in the JPML on November 21, 2023. In addition, this order does not address or resolve Defendant's request for an overall stay of the litigation pending arbitration, which was requested in Defendant's motion to compel arbitration. That issue will be resolved by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 11/27/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jrh)
November 27, 2023 Filing 22 Joint Motion to Stay Scheduling Order Deadlines. On November 21, 2023, Defendant filed a motion to compel arbitration and a memorandum in support. ECF Nos. 20-21. In response to a November 21, 2023 email from the Magistrate Judge's chambers, on November 22, 2023, the parties jointly requested a stay of the deadlines in the #11 initial order regarding planning and scheduling, as amended, pending a ruling on the motion to compel arbitration. For clarity of the docket, the Court will treat this request as a joint motion. (referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz) (jrh)
November 21, 2023 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Defendant America Multi-Cinema, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Martinez Declaration))(Gadberry, Anna)
November 21, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Defendant America Multi-Cinema, Inc. (Gadberry, Anna)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tara D. Kennedy for America Multi-Cinema, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 11/1/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
November 1, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for attorney Tara D. Kennedy to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6192056.) by Defendant America Multi-Cinema, Inc. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz.) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Gadberry, Anna)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend All Pending Deadlines. The Court grants the Motion both as unopposed and for good cause shown, but with slight modifications to the proposed deadlines to accommodate the Court's schedule. On or before November 21, 2023, Defendant is ordered to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. The parties' proposed scheduling order, a redline version, and copies of the parties' Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures must be submitted to the Magistrate Judge's chambers at ksd_schwartz_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov on or before November 30, 2023. The Court resets the scheduling conference for December 13, 2023, at 3:00 p.m. by phone (888-363-4749; access code 5705809). Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 10/26/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jrh)
October 26, 2023 Filing 16 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend All Pending Deadlines by Defendant America Multi-Cinema, Inc. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz.) (Gadberry, Anna)
October 6, 2023 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Melanie Newman identifying None as corporate parent. (Brady, Maureen)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines. The Court grants the Motion both as unopposed and for good cause shown. The parties' proposed scheduling order, a redline version, and copies of the parties' Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures must be submitted to the Magistrate Judge's chambers at ksd_schwartz_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov on or before November 3, 2023. The Court resets the scheduling conference for November 15, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. by phone (888-363-4749; access code 5705809). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (drk)
October 3, 2023 Filing 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Certain Deadlines by Defendant America Multi-Cinema, Inc. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz.) (Gadberry, Anna)
September 18, 2023 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service re Summons Issued, by Melanie Newman. (Brady, Maureen)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for October 17, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 5705809) before Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 9/26/2023. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 10/6/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 10/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 09/15/2023. (drk)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew C. Wolfe for America Multi-Cinema, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 9/12/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kas)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Court grants the motion as unopposed and directs Defendant American Multi-Cinema, Inc. d/b/a AMC Theaters to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before October 30, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 9/12/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jrh)
September 12, 2023 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant America Multi-Cinema, Inc. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz.) (Gadberry, Anna)
September 12, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Matthew C. Wolfe to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6150671.) by Defendant America Multi-Cinema, Inc. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz.) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form Matthew C. Wolfe ECF Form)(Gadberry, Anna)
September 12, 2023 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by America Multi-Cinema, Inc. identifying AMC Entertainment Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent. (Gadberry, Anna)
September 12, 2023 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Anna A. Gadberry on behalf of America Multi-Cinema, Inc. (Gadberry, Anna)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gary M. Klinger for Melanie Newman pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 8/21/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
August 21, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Gary M. Klinger to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6135066.) by Plaintiff Melanie Newman. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Brady, Maureen)
August 18, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jsh)
August 18, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to America Multi-Cinema, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh)
August 17, 2023 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Melanie Newman - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Brady, Maureen) Modified docket text on 8/18/2023. (jsh)
August 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6132667.), filed by Melanie Newman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Brady, Maureen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newman v. America Multi-Cinema, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Newman
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Represented By: Lucy McShane
Represented By: Maureen M Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America Multi-Cinema, Inc. doing business as AMC Theaters
Represented By: Anna A. Gadberry
Represented By: Matthew C. Wolfe
Represented By: Tara Danielle Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?