Lew v. Medical Eye Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Lew
Defendant: Medical Eye Services, Inc. and California Physicians Service doing business as Blue Shield of California
Case Number: 1:2024cv11558
Filed: June 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2024 Filing 28 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO Number Transfer Order entered June 7, 2024 entered in MDL No. 3083, Northern District of California case number 4:24-cv-00532-JST has been transferred to the District of Massachusetts and assigned civil action number: 1:24-cv-11558-ADB. In Re: MOVEit Customer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL 3083. (Belpedio, Lisa)
June 14, 2024 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. (Belpedio, Lisa)
June 14, 2024 Filing 26 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:24-cv-00532.
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the District of Massachusetts. Signed by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 6/12/2024. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2024) Modified on 6/12/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING JPML ACTION re #7 MOTION to Remand to Alameda County Superior Court filed by Patrick Lew, #21 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Medical Eye Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 25, 2024. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2024)
March 22, 2024 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING. Before the Court is the Motion to Remand to Alameda County Superior Court. ECF No. #7 . Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 78(b) and Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the Court finds the matter suitable for disposition without oral argument. The hearing on this matter, currently scheduled for, April 4, 2024 is hereby VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2024)
March 12, 2024 Filing 22 REPLY (re #7 MOTION to Remand to Alameda County Superior Court ) filed byPatrick Lew. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam E. Polk in Support of Reply)(Polk, Adam) (Filed on 3/12/2024)
March 5, 2024 Filing 21 Memorandum in Opposition (re #7 MOTION to Remand to Alameda County Superior Court ) filed by Medical Eye Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Cutts, Kyle) (Filed on 3/5/2024) Modified on 3/6/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND re #7 MOTION to Remand to Alameda County Superior Court filed by Patrick Lew, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Remand to Alameda County Superior Court, #19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand., Motions terminated: #19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Patrick Lew, Medical Eye Services, Inc., California Physicians' Service. Responses due by 3/5/2024. Replies due by 3/12/2024. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 1, 2024. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2024)
February 28, 2024 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Medical Eye Services, Inc., Patrick Lew and California Physicians' Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cutts, Kyle) (Filed on 2/28/2024) Modified on 2/29/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #17 Stipulation. Replies due by 3/7/2024. Responses due by 2/29/2024.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2024)
February 9, 2024 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Briefing Schedule re #7 MOTION to Remand to Alameda County Superior Court filed by Medical Eye Services, Inc., California Physicians' Service d/b/a Blue Shield of California, Patrick Lew (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cutts, Kyle) (Filed on 2/9/2024) Modified on 2/12/2024 (kmm2, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2024 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by California Physicians' Service (Dailey, Michael) (Filed on 2/7/2024) Modified on 2/8/2024 (kmm2, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Dailey (Dailey, Michael) (Filed on 2/7/2024)
February 7, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig J. Mariam (Mariam, Craig) (Filed on 2/7/2024)
February 5, 2024 Filing 13 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A combined list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than March 20, 2024 by 2:00 p.m. for the Motion hearing and April 29, 2024 by 2:00 p.m. for the CMC.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/., Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Remand to Alameda County Superior Court. Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2024)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by Clerk on 2/5/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2024)
February 2, 2024 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2024)
February 2, 2024 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Medical Eye Services, Inc... (Cutts, Kyle) (Filed on 2/2/2024)
February 1, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Cole Limbach (Limbach, Cole) (Filed on 2/1/2024)
February 1, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Patrick Lew.. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 2/1/2024)
February 1, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to Alameda County Superior Court filed by Patrick Lew. Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 2/15/2024. Replies due by 2/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam E. Polk, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Polk, Adam) (Filed on 2/1/2024)
February 1, 2024 Filing 6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint filed by Medical Eye Services, Inc., Patrick Lew, California Physicians' Service (Cutts, Kyle) (Filed on 2/1/2024) Modified on 2/1/2024 (kc, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/2/2024 (kmm2, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2024 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary re: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Medical Eye Services, Inc. ***Correct Event is Stipulation without Proposed Order.*** (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2024)
January 30, 2024 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Medical Eye Services, Inc. Re Initial Pleadings (Ahmadian, Kamran) (Filed on 1/30/2024)
January 30, 2024 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 29, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/12/2024. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2024)
January 29, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Medical Eye Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent EssilorLuxottica S.A., Corporate Parent EssilorLuxottica USA Inc. for Medical Eye Services, Inc.. (Cutts, Kyle) (Filed on 1/29/2024)
January 29, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of Alameda. Their case number is 23CV057175. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19068249). Filed by Medical Eye Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ahmadian, Kamran) (Filed on 1/29/2024) Modified on 1/30/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lew v. Medical Eye Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Lew
Represented By: Adam E. Polk
Represented By: Jordan Nadine Isern
Represented By: Simon S Grille
Represented By: Cole Limbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Eye Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle T. Cutts
Represented By: Kamran Benjamin Ahmadian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Physicians Service doing business as Blue Shield of California
Represented By: Craig J Mariam
Represented By: Michael J. Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?