UMG Recordings, Inc. et al v. Suno, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Capitol Records, LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Atlantic Records Group LLC, Warner Records Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited and Rhino Entertainment LLC
Defendant: Suno, Inc. and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2024cv11611
Filed: June 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. § 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2024 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Rajan Trehan on behalf of Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Records Inc. (Trehan, Rajan)
August 8, 2024 Filing 36 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Rajan Trehan. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
August 7, 2024 Filing 35 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Rajan Trehan Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10544683 by Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Records Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Rajan Trehan)(Arnold, Alexandra)
August 6, 2024 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert N Klieger on behalf of Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Records Inc. (Klieger, Robert)
August 2, 2024 Filing 33 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Robert N. Klieger. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
August 2, 2024 Filing 32 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert N. Klieger Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10536823 by Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Records Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of R. Klieger)(Arnold, Alexandra)
August 1, 2024 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Mariah Rivera on behalf of Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Records Inc. (Rivera, Mariah)
August 1, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Perry on behalf of Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Records Inc. (Perry, Alexander)
August 1, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Moez M. Kaba on behalf of Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Records Inc. (Kaba, Moez)
August 1, 2024 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Suno, Inc..(Fellig, Shloime)
July 10, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Taylor on behalf of Suno, Inc. (Taylor, Nathan)
July 10, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Arnold on behalf of Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Records Inc. (Arnold, Alexandra)
July 10, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany N. Lovejoy on behalf of Suno, Inc. (Lovejoy, Brittany)
July 10, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarang Damle on behalf of Suno, Inc. (Damle, Sarang)
July 10, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Gass on behalf of Suno, Inc. (Gass, Andrew)
July 10, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Steve Feldman on behalf of Suno, Inc. (Feldman, Steve)
July 10, 2024 Filing 21 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and to Establish Briefing Schedule. BRIEFING SCHEDULE:Defendant to file answer or respond by 8/1/24.Plaintiff opposition if Defendant moves to dismiss due by 8/29/24.Defendant to file reply by 9/12/24. (McKillop, Matthew)
July 10, 2024 Filing 20 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Mariah N. Rivera. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
July 10, 2024 Filing 19 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Alexander R. Perry. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
July 10, 2024 Filing 18 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Moez M. Kaba. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
July 10, 2024 Filing 17 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mariah N. Rivera Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10499300 by Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Records Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Rivera)(Cloherty, Daniel)
July 10, 2024 Filing 16 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Steven N. Feldman, Andrew M. Gass, Sarang V. Damle, Brittany N. Lovejoy, and Nathan Taylor. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
July 10, 2024 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alexander R. Perry Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10499269 by Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Records Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of A. Perry)(Cloherty, Daniel)
July 10, 2024 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Moez M. Kaba Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10499236 by Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Records Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Kaba)(Cloherty, Daniel)
July 9, 2024 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and to Establish Briefing Schedule by Suno, Inc..(Fellig, Shloime)
July 9, 2024 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Steven N. Feldman, Andrew M. Gass, Sarang V. Damle, Brittany N. Lovejoy, and Nathan Taylor Filing fee: $ 625, receipt number AMADC-10498591 by Suno, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Steven N. Feldman, #2 Certification of Andrew M. Gass, #3 Certification of Sarang V. Damle, #4 Certification of Brittany N. Lovejoy, #5 Certification of Nathan Taylor)(Fellig, Shloime)
July 9, 2024 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Suno, Inc.. (Fellig, Shloime)
July 9, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Shloime Fellig on behalf of Suno, Inc. (Fellig, Shloime)
July 9, 2024 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Rhino Entertainment LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., Warner Records Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Warner Music International Services Limited, Atlantic Recording Corporation, UMG Recordings, Inc., Atlantic Records Group LLC. Suno, Inc. served on 6/27/2024, answer due 7/18/2024. (Cloherty, Daniel)
June 26, 2024 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia)
June 25, 2024 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Cowan, Nicole)
June 25, 2024 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case . (Attachments: #1 Sound Recordings at Issue)(Cloherty, Daniel)
June 24, 2024 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Records Inc.. (Cloherty, Daniel)
June 24, 2024 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Report on Filing or Determination re: Copyright - AO 121. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Report on the filing/termination of copyright case. (Cook, Savannah)
June 24, 2024 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (Cook, Savannah)
June 24, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Records Inc.. (Cloherty, Daniel)
June 24, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10475153 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Records Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Sound Recordings at Issue, #3 Additional Suno Outputs Resembling Copyrighted Recordings, #4 Placeholder for Audio Files)(Cloherty, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UMG Recordings, Inc. et al v. Suno, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Robert N Klieger
Represented By: Rajan Trehan
Represented By: Moez M. Kaba
Represented By: Mariah Rivera
Represented By: Alexandra Arnold
Represented By: Alexander Perry
Represented By: Daniel J. Cloherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony Music Entertainment
Represented By: Robert N Klieger
Represented By: Rajan Trehan
Represented By: Moez M. Kaba
Represented By: Mariah Rivera
Represented By: Alexandra Arnold
Represented By: Alexander Perry
Represented By: Daniel J. Cloherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Recording Corporation
Represented By: Robert N Klieger
Represented By: Rajan Trehan
Represented By: Moez M. Kaba
Represented By: Mariah Rivera
Represented By: Alexandra Arnold
Represented By: Alexander Perry
Represented By: Daniel J. Cloherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol Records, LLC
Represented By: Robert N Klieger
Represented By: Rajan Trehan
Represented By: Moez M. Kaba
Represented By: Mariah Rivera
Represented By: Alexandra Arnold
Represented By: Alexander Perry
Represented By: Daniel J. Cloherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UMG Recordings, Inc.
Represented By: Robert N Klieger
Represented By: Rajan Trehan
Represented By: Moez M. Kaba
Represented By: Mariah Rivera
Represented By: Alexandra Arnold
Represented By: Alexander Perry
Represented By: Daniel J. Cloherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Records Group LLC
Represented By: Robert N Klieger
Represented By: Rajan Trehan
Represented By: Moez M. Kaba
Represented By: Mariah Rivera
Represented By: Alexandra Arnold
Represented By: Alexander Perry
Represented By: Daniel J. Cloherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner Records Inc.
Represented By: Robert N Klieger
Represented By: Rajan Trehan
Represented By: Moez M. Kaba
Represented By: Mariah Rivera
Represented By: Alexandra Arnold
Represented By: Alexander Perry
Represented By: Daniel J. Cloherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner Music International Services Limited
Represented By: Robert N Klieger
Represented By: Rajan Trehan
Represented By: Moez M. Kaba
Represented By: Mariah Rivera
Represented By: Alexandra Arnold
Represented By: Alexander Perry
Represented By: Daniel J. Cloherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhino Entertainment LLC
Represented By: Robert N Klieger
Represented By: Rajan Trehan
Represented By: Moez M. Kaba
Represented By: Mariah Rivera
Represented By: Alexandra Arnold
Represented By: Alexander Perry
Represented By: Daniel J. Cloherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suno, Inc.
Represented By: Steve Feldman
Represented By: Shloime Fellig
Represented By: Sarang Damle
Represented By: Nathan Taylor
Represented By: Brittany N. Lovejoy
Represented By: Andrew Gass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?