Bishay v. Gelpi et al
Plaintiff: Pro Se Party Bahig F. Bishay
Defendant: Circuit Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi, John Mcconnell, Bruce Syla and Lara Montecalvo
Case Number: 1:2024cv12331
Filed: September 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Julia E Kobick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2024 Filing 15 Copy re 14 Electronic Order mailed to Bahig F. Bishay on 11/6/2024. (Currie, Haley)
November 6, 2024 Filing 14 District Judge Julia E. Kobick: ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #13 Motion to Place the Order of Dismissal Dated November 1, 2024 in Abeyance During the Pendency of the District of Columbia Matter Referenced Therein. (Currie, Haley)
November 4, 2024 Filing 13 Plaintiff's MOTION to Place the Order of Dismissal Dated November 1, 2024 in Abeyance During the Pendency of the District of Columbia Matter Referenced Therein by Bahig F. Bishay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Currie, Haley)
November 1, 2024 Filing 12 Copy mailed to plaintiff (#10) and one copy of the Order of Dismissal (#11)Bahig F. BishayP.O. Box 396Norwood, MA 02062 (on 11-1-24) (Castilla, Francis)
November 1, 2024 Filing 11 District Judge Julia E. Kobick: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(PSSA, 4)
November 1, 2024 Filing 10 District Judge Julia E. Kobick: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered denying #2 Motion for leave to electronically file Pro Se; denying #9 Motion for entry of default. This action is DISMISSED. (PSSA, 4)
October 31, 2024 Filing 9 Plaintiff's Rule 54 & 55 Application for the Entry of Default; Default Judgment; and Final Judgment by Bahig F. Bishay. (Attachments: #1 Rule 54 and 55 Affidavit, #2 National Judgment Calculations)(Currie, Haley)
October 17, 2024 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AFFIDAVIT by Bahig F. Bishay. All Defendants served on 10/4/2024, answer due 10/25/2024. (Attachments: #1 Service re: John Mcconnell, #2 Service re: Gustavo A. Gelpi, #3 Service re: Bruce Syla, #4 Service re: Lara Montecalvo)(Kelly, Danielle)
September 17, 2024 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Reassignment. District Judge Julia E. Kobick assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jessica D. Hedges. (Horvath, Courtney)
September 11, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to John Mcconnell, Lara Montecalvo, Bruce Syla. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Horvath, Courtney)
September 11, 2024 Filing 5 Copy mailed of 1 - set of complaint and summonses to : Bahig F. Bishay P.O. Box 396 Norwood, MA 02062on 9-11-24. (Castilla, Francis)
September 11, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gustavo A. Gelpi. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Horvath, Courtney)
September 11, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Jessica D. Hedges assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Martin, Jacqueline)
September 3, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to file electronically Pro Se by Bahig F. Bishay.(Castilla, Francis)
September 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gustavo A. Gelpi, filed by Bahig F. Bishay. (Attachments: #1 Category Form Category Form, #2 Letter)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishay v. Gelpi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pro Se Party Bahig F. Bishay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circuit Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mcconnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Syla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lara Montecalvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?