Springfield Electrical Company, Inc. v. Kallidus Technologies Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Springfield Electrical Company, Inc.
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Kallidus Technologies Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv30153
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kallidus Technologies, Inc. and Fidelity against Springfield Electrical Company, Inc., filed by Springfield Electrical Company, Inc..(Farrell, William)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kallidus Technologies Inc., Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7324356 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Springfield Electrical Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Farrell, William) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/19/2018) (Lindsay, Maurice). (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/20/2018) (Lindsay, Maurice).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Springfield Electrical Company, Inc. v. Kallidus Technologies Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kallidus Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Springfield Electrical Company, Inc.
Represented By: William P. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?