Roscoe v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Ray Roscoe
Defendant: TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC.
Case Number: 3:2018cv30154
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 20 Opposition re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ray Roscoe. (Morneau, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2018 Filing 19 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying, without prejudice, #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and #14 Motion for Extension of Time, as moot. In light of the filing of the #15 Amended Complaint and #16 Motion to Dismiss (addressed to the Amended Complaint), the original motion to dismiss and motion for extension of time are now moot. (Bartlett, Timothy)
October 26, 2018 Filing 18 Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Skanes, Mark)
October 26, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Skanes, Mark)
October 26, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc..(Skanes, Mark)
October 12, 2018 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., filed by Ray Roscoe.(Morneau, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to 14 days after ruling on Motion to Remand to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Ray Roscoe.(Morneau, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Ray Roscoe. (Morneau, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Ray Roscoe.(Morneau, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Finn, Mary)
October 11, 2018 Filing 10 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Skanes, Mark)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 STATE COURT Record. (Skanes, Mark)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed on or before the close of business on October 12, 2018. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Calderon, Melissa)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Skanes, Mark)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc..(Skanes, Mark)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 Remark: Certified Notice of Removal mailed to defense counsel. (Figueroa, Tamara)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Lindsay, Maurice).
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC.. (Skanes, Mark)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Skanes on behalf of TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC. (Skanes, Mark)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7328451 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Skanes, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roscoe v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Roscoe
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Morneau
Represented By: Andrea C. Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC.
Represented By: Mark W. Skanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?