United States of America v. Kallidus Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pittsfield Pipers, Inc. and United States of America
Defendant: Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland, Kallidus Technologies, Inc. and Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv30159
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina A. Fonte on behalf of Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland, Inc., Kallidus Technologies, Inc. (Fonte, Gina)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff D. Bernarducci on behalf of Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland, Inc., Kallidus Technologies, Inc. (Bernarducci, Jeff)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting the Defendants' #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland, Inc. answer due 11/27/2018; Kallidus Technologies, Inc. answer due 11/27/2018. (Finn, Mary)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to November 27, 2018 to Respond to Complaint by Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland, Inc., Kallidus Technologies, Inc..(Bernarducci, Jeff) Modified on 10/29/2018 to change the relief type of the motion to MOTION to Extend Time to file an Answer. (Finn, Mary).
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland, Inc., Kallidus Technologies, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Lindsay, Maurice).
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES by Plaintiff Pittsfield Pipers, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0101-7341859. Payment Type : INITIATING DOCUMENT. (Valicenti, David)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: US Government), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #2 CATEGORY FORM)(Valicenti, David) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/27/2018) (Lindsay, Maurice).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Kallidus Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kallidus Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Gina A. Fonte
Represented By: Jeff D. Bernarducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Gina A. Fonte
Represented By: Jeff D. Bernarducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pittsfield Pipers, Inc.
Represented By: David E. Valicenti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?