LaSanta Morales v. Social Security Administration et al

Plaintiff: Eliezer Jose LaSanta Morales
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill, Social Security Administration and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2018cv30186
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 Copy re 5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 Procedural Order re Social Security Action, #7 Summons Issued mailed to Eliezer LaSanta Morales, 269 Stony Hill Road, Apt. 103, Wilbraham, MA 01095 on 12/11/2018.. (Finn, Mary)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill and forwarded to the Pltf. along with blank Marshal Service Forms to be completed and returned so the Marshals may make service. (Finn, Mary)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered. Procedural Order re Social Security Action; cc/Pltf. (Finn, Mary)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; cc/Pltf. (Finn, Mary)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia)
November 23, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Eliezer Jose LaSanta Morales. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11) (Figueroa, Tamara) (Main Document 1 replaced, redacted & correction on 11/23/2018) (Figueroa, Tamara). Modified on 11/23/2018 (Figueroa, Tamara).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaSanta Morales v. Social Security Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Christopher Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliezer Jose LaSanta Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?