Yando v. Azar

Plaintiff: Raymond A. Yando
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 3:2018cv30193
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Raymond A. Yando. Alex M. Azar, II served on 12/22/2018, answer due 2/20/2019. (Lindsay, Maurice)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed on U.S. Attorney General by Raymond A. Yando. (Lindsay, Maurice)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed on U.S. Dept. of Health by Raymond A. Yando. (Lindsay, Maurice)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Filing fee/payment: $ 400.00, receipt number SPR003918 for #1 Complaint, (Lindsay, Maurice)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 Remark: Summons sent to Plaintiff via mail along with instructions. (Figueroa, Tamara)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar, II. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Figueroa, Tamara)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Finn, Mary)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar, II, filed by Raymond A. Yando. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Copy of Filing Fee) (Figueroa, Tamara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yando v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond A. Yando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?