Pereira v. Laurent Bernard Et Fils Inc.
Plaintiff: Leonor Pereira
Defendant: Laurent Bernard ET Fils Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv11371
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: SCHEDULING ORDER entered. A hearing on any filed dispositive motions will be held at 11:00 am on August 11, 2020. If noMotions for Summary Judgment are filed, this hearing shall be converted to an initial pretrial conference. It is So Ordered. See the attached scheduling order for all other deadlines and complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: Scheduling Conference held on 8/6/2019. Present: Atty Massiel L. Sanchez for deft. In the absence of counsel for pltf, court has brief colloquy with counsel for deft and, with no scheduling disputes reported or expected, issues scheduling. Pltf may report any issues or move for relief if and when any arise. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Alice Moran at alice.moran@verizon.net.) (Bartlett, Timothy)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Sanchez, Massiel)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Massiel L. Sanchez on behalf of Laurent Bernard ET Fils Inc. (Sanchez, Massiel)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING **CHANGE TO TIME ONLY** Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2019 at 9:30 AM in Franklin Courtroom before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni. (Bartlett, Timothy)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT Record. (Shapiro, Beata)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Remark: Electronic Certified Copy of Notice of Removal sent to defense counsel for service on the State Court. (Figueroa, Tamara)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference ISSUED. Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2019 at 11:30 AM in Franklin Courtroom before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni. (See Scheduling Order for complete details). (Rivera, Christina)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Healy, Bethaney)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by LAURENT BERNARD ET FILS INC..(Shapiro, Beata)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Case transferred to Western Division (Springfield) (DeMaria, Timothy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LAURENT BERNARD ET FILS INC. (Shapiro, Beata)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LAURENT BERNARD ET FILS INC. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7743185 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shapiro, Beata) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/21/2019 due to original JS45 selected incorrect division) (DeMaria, Timothy). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2019: #2 JS45 Local Category Form) (DeMaria, Timothy).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pereira v. Laurent Bernard Et Fils Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonor Pereira
Represented By: Dennis P. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurent Bernard ET Fils Inc.
Represented By: Beata Shapiro
Represented By: Massiel L. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?