57 East Pleasant Street, LLC v. AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY, et al.

Plaintiff: 57 East Pleasant Street, LLC
Defendant: AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY and Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Companies in cooperation with Phillips Insurance Agency
Case Number: 3:2019cv11478
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT Record. (O'Connor, David)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY.. (O'Connor, David)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY.(O'Connor, David)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email to: doconnor@oconnorllc.com (Rivera, Christina)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 Set/Reset Deadlines: AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY 7/29/2019; Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Companies in cooperation with Phillips Insurance Agency 7/29/2019. (Healy, Bethaney)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Healy, Bethaney)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Case transferred to Western Division (Springfield). (DeMaria, Timothy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7767260 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Local Category Form) (O'Connor, David)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. O'Connor on behalf of AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY (O'Connor, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 57 East Pleasant Street, LLC v. AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: David M. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Companies in cooperation with Phillips Insurance Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 57 East Pleasant Street, LLC
Represented By: Christopher D. Strang
Represented By: Andrea N. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?