Fields v. Williamson
Plaintiff: Suzanne Fields
Defendant: Kyle Williamson
Case Number: 3:2019cv11555
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Kyle Williamson.(Donohue, John)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Donohue on behalf of Kyle Williamson (Donohue, John)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Suzanne Fields. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by Suzanne Fields. (Doyle, William)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Un-Executed as Kyle Williamson. Service was attempted but unable to be completed. Modified on 8/22/2019 to correct the text to reflect the Defendant WAS NOT SERVED. (Finn, Mary).
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kyle Williamson. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Healy, Bethaney)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Healy, Bethaney)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Case transferred to Western Division (Springfield) (Danieli, Chris)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kyle Williamson Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7784180 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Suzanne Fields. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil action cover sheet, #2 category sheet)(Doyle, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields v. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Williamson
Represented By: John P. Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Fields
Represented By: William J. Doyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?