Langlois et al v. Juul Labs, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christine Langlois, Andrea Saldana and Lisa Yore
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv11967
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 Electronic notice to counsel: This civil action has been transferred to the California Northern District and assigned civil case number 3:19-cv-06926. (Danieli, Chris)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 Case Electronically transferred to the Northern District of California pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 10/16/2019. (Figueroa, Tamara)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number CTO-1 in MDL Case 2913 received from the Northern District of California requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Figueroa, Tamara)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 1 in MDL Case 2913 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ORDER entered granting #5 Motion to Stay. ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING JPML DETERMINATION. (Bartlett, Timothy)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Determination by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Determination)(Francisco, Ana)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Healy, Bethaney)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Healy, Bethaney)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Case transferred to Western Division (Springfield) (Vieira, Leonardo)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Juul Labs, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7879658 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Christine Langlois, Andrea Saldana, Lisa Yore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Local Category Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Williams-Derry, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langlois et al v. Juul Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Ana M. Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Langlois
Represented By: Amy Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Saldana
Represented By: Amy Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Yore
Represented By: Amy Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?