Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Martha Moyer and Andre C Miller
Case Number: 3:2019cv12274
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Andre C Miller served on 11/29/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Badway, Ernest)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Martha Moyer served on 11/29/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Badway, Ernest)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Healy, Bethaney)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Healy, Bethaney)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred to Western Division (Springfield). (Jones, Sherry)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet, #1 Complaint, Category Sheet by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Badway, Ernest)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Badway, Ernest)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against Andre C. Miller and Martha Moyer by against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7957469 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Badway, Ernest)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre C Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Ernest E. Badway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?