Woods v. Collins
Plaintiff: R. Susan Woods
Defendant: Chapter 7 Trustee Joseph B. Collins
Case Number: 3:2019cv30029
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail. (Finn, Mary)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 Copy re 5 Order, mailed to R. Susan Woods on 3/7/19. (Lindsay, Maurice)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re Notice of Removal #1 . This case arises out of proceedings in the Bankruptcy of R. Susan Woods, currently pending before the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Massachusetts (18-BR-30549-EDK). The debtor, R. Susan Woods, seeks relief from three Bankruptcy Court orders issued on February 14, 15, and 26, 2019. Woods already appealed each order, and those appeals are pending (19-CV-10321-DJC, 19-CV-30023-FDS, & 19-CV-30028-RGS). Woods also filed a civil action in Hampshire County Superior Court seeking a temporary restraining order staying those three orders. (Dkt. No. 2 at 3-17.) The Chapter 7 Trustee removed the civil action to this court and requests the court refer it to the Bankruptcy Court. (Dkt. No. 1.) Under this court's Local Rules, "any and all cases arising under Title 11 United States Code and any and all proceedings arising under Title 11 or arising in or related to a case under Title 11 shall be referred to the judges of the bankruptcy court for the District of Massachusetts." L.R. 201 (emphasis added); see also 28 U.S.C. 157(a) (permitting a district court to refer cases and proceedings arising under Title 11 or related to a case under Title 11 to the district's bankruptcy judges). Thus, the Trustee's request is allowed, and this case is transferred to the Bankruptcy Court.(Lindsay, Maurice)
March 7, 2019 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund re #1 Notice of Removal, for $400.00 paid on 03/04/2019, receipt number 0101-7565963. (Adam, Lucien)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal by Joseph B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Collins, Joseph)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal by Joseph B. Collins. (Collins, Joseph)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Joseph B. Collins ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7566002 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Collins, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Susan Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapter 7 Trustee Joseph B. Collins
Represented By: Joseph B. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?