Scott v. Chang et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Scott
Defendant: Danny Lee, Robert Chang, Newegg.com Americas Inc. and Newegg.com Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv30037
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Timothy Scott (Lindsay, Maurice)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Robert Chang, Danny Lee (Rollinson, James)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #5 Defendants Chang and Lee's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to The Complaint #1 . Robert Chang must answer, move or otherwise respond by 4/10/2019; Danny Lee must answer, move or otherwise respond by 4/10/2019. (Rivera, Christina)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 10, 2019 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Robert Chang, Danny Lee.(Rollinson, James)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 Remark: : A Certified copy of the Notice of Removal has been emailed today to Defendants Counsel for service on the State Court in order to obtain the certified State Court record. (Lindsay, Maurice)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. The notice of removal was incorrectly filed as a complaint, the correct event for the notice of removal can be found under the "notice menu" the text has been changed to complaint. (Lindsay, Maurice)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Newegg.com Americas Inc., Danny Lee, Robert Chang Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7594473 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Danny Lee, Robert Chang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rollinson, James) Modified on 3/21/2019 to edit text from complaint to notice of removal (Lindsay, Maurice).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Chang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Lee
Represented By: James H. Rollinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Chang
Represented By: James H. Rollinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newegg.com Americas Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newegg.com Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?