Joubert v. Ocwen Loan Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Daniel J Joubert
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv30048
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 Copy re #6 Summons Issued, #7 General Order 09-1, 5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis mailed to Daniel J Joubert, 29 Northern Berland Street, Springfield, MA 01109 on 4/12/2019. (Finn, Mary)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered; cc/Pltf. (Finn, Mary)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ocwen Loan Services, LLC and forwarded along with blank marshal service form to the Pltf. to be completed and returned so the Marshals may make service. (Finn, Mary)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; cc/Pltf. (Finn, Mary)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered REFERRING 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Daniel J Joubert to Magistrate Judge Robertson. (Healy, Bethaney)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Finn, Mary)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ocwen Loan Services, LLC, filed by Daniel J Joubert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit). (Rivera, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joubert v. Ocwen Loan Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel J Joubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?