Epstein v. Miller Brothers Furniture Inc.
Plaintiff: John Epstein
Defendant: Miller Brothers Furniture Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv30082
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting Motion to Consolidate Cases (Dkt. No. 21, filed in 19-cv-30055).The parties are directed to docket all further filings in 19-cv-30055 only, with captions reflecting that consolidation has occurred and containing both case numbers. (Lindsay, Maurice)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 Direct Results ANSWER to Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses by John Epstein.(Linderman, John)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING **CHANGE TO TIME ONLY** Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2019 at 9:30 AM in Franklin Courtroom before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni. (Bartlett, Timothy)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Underwood on behalf of Miller Brothers Furniture Inc. (Underwood, Steven)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Figueroa, Tamara)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference ISSUED. Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2019 at 11:00 AM in Franklin Courtroom before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni. (See Notice for details). (Rivera, Christina)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against John Epstein by Miller Brothers Furniture Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter March 8, 2019, #2 Exhibit Letter April 8, 2019)(Griffin, Joan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Steven Underwood Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7771899 by Miller Brothers Furniture Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Steven Underwood)(Griffin, Joan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joan M. Griffin on behalf of Miller Brothers Furniture Inc. (Griffin, Joan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by John Epstein. Miller Brothers Furniture Inc. served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. Acknowledgment filed by John Epstein. (Linderman, John)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Miller Brothers Furniture Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Finn, Mary)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case. (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Miller Brothers Furniture Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7739714 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by John Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Supplement)(Linderman, John) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/19/2019) (Lindsay, Maurice).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epstein v. Miller Brothers Furniture Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Epstein
Represented By: John C. Linderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller Brothers Furniture Inc.
Represented By: Steven L. Underwood
Represented By: Joan M. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?