Green Earth Energy Photovoltaic Corporation et al v. KeyCorp. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Scyocurka, Green Earth Energy Photovoltaic Corporation and Paige Scyocurka
Defendant: Keybank National Association, KeyCorp. and Doug Beebe
Case Number: 3:2019cv30123
Filed: August 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 38 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting, in part, #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. For the reasons set forth in open court, the motion is allowed on a temporary basis through November 8, 2019, at which time the court will consider whether to further extend the injunction. (Rivera, Christina)
October 9, 2019 Filing 37 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: Motion Hearing held on 10/9/2019 re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Christopher Scyocurka, Paige Scyocurka, Green Earth Energy Photovoltaic Corporation. Present: Attys Timothy J. Wilton, Benjamin H. Duggan for the plaintiffs, Attys Donald R. Frederico, Melanie A. Conroy, Jessica Salisbury-Cooper for the defendants. Court has colloquy with counsel, hears argument. Court allows preliminary injunction to the extent, and for the reasons, stated in court. Order to follow. Status Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 11:00 AM in Franklin Courtroom before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni. (Court Reporter: Alice Moran at alice.moran@verizon.net.) (Bartlett, Timothy)
October 7, 2019 Filing 35 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting **CHANGE TO TIME ONLY** Hearing on Motion #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 at 11:00 AM in Franklin Courtroom before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni. (Bartlett, Timothy)
October 3, 2019 Filing 34 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion to Seal. The motion is granted on a preliminary basis to allow Defendants to file documents under seal prior to the hearing on October 9, 2019. The court will hear argument at that time as to whether the documents filed under seal shall remain sealed. (Rivera, Christina)
October 3, 2019 Filing 33 Second AFFIDAVIT in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Green Earth Energy Photovoltaic Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23)(Duggan, Benjamin)
October 3, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Green Earth Energy Photovoltaic Corporation. (Duggan, Benjamin)
October 3, 2019 Filing 31 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #30 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Reply. Counsel should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted using the Electronic Case Filing System and in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include the date on which leave was granted in the caption of the document. (Lindsay, Maurice)
October 2, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Reply with LR 7.1 Certification by Green Earth Energy Photovoltaic Corporation.(Duggan, Benjamin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2019: #1 Reply, #2 Second Affidavit Chris Scyocurka, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23) (Figueroa, Tamara).
October 2, 2019 Filing 29 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying without prejudice #26 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply for failure to certify compliance with Local Rule 7.1(a)(2) by conferring with opposing counsel and indicating to the court whether the motion will be opposed. Consistent with its denial of #26 the court also strikes #27 the reply memorandum filed by Plaintiffs and #28 supporting exhibits because they were filed without leave of the court. (Rivera, Christina)
October 1, 2019 Filing 28 Second AFFIDAVIT of Christopher Scyocurka in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Green Earth Energy Photovoltaic Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23)(Duggan, Benjamin)
October 1, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Green Earth Energy Photovoltaic Corporation. (Duggan, Benjamin)
October 1, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Green Earth Energy Photovoltaic Corporation.(Duggan, Benjamin)
September 18, 2019 Filing 25 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jessica E. Salisbury-Copper. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Figueroa, Tamara)
September 17, 2019 Filing 24 DECLARATION re #21 Opposition to Motion of David Baker by Doug Beebe, KeyCorp., Keybank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Conroy, Melanie)
September 17, 2019 Filing 23 DECLARATION re #21 Opposition to Motion of Doug Beebe by Doug Beebe, KeyCorp., Keybank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Conroy, Melanie)
September 17, 2019 Filing 22 DECLARATION re #21 Opposition to Motion of Jodi MacKinnon by Doug Beebe, KeyCorp., Keybank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24)(Conroy, Melanie)
September 17, 2019 Filing 21 Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Doug Beebe, KeyCorp., Keybank National Association. (Conroy, Melanie)
September 16, 2019 Filing 20 Opposition re #16 MOTION to Seal Document In Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Green Earth Energy Photovoltaic Corporation. (Duggan, Benjamin)
September 13, 2019 Filing 19 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered directing Plaintiffs to file their opposition, if any, to Defendants Motion to Seal #16 no later than 12:00 noon on Monday September 16, 2019. (Lindsay, Maurice)
September 12, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 at 11:30 AM in Franklin Courtroom before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni. (Bartlett, Timothy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 17 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion to Continue. Notice to follow. (Bartlett, Timothy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Seal Document In Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Doug Beebe, KeyCorp., Keybank National Association.(Conroy, Melanie)
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jessica E. Salisbury-Copper Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7872077 by KeyCorp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of JEssica E. Salisbury-Copper)(Conroy, Melanie)
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing to October 9, 2019 by Green Earth Energy Photovoltaic Corporation.(Cook, Kathy)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Green Earth Energy Photovoltaic Corporation. All Defendants. (Duggan, Benjamin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2019 at 2:00 PM in Franklin Courtroom before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni. This hearing will not be evidentiary. Should an evidentiary hearing become necessary, it will be scheduled separately. (Bartlett, Timothy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie A. Conroy on behalf of Doug Beebe, KeyCorp., Keybank National Association (Conroy, Melanie)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald R. Frederico on behalf of Doug Beebe, KeyCorp., Keybank National Association (Frederico, Donald)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction to the extent Plaintiffs have requested a hearing on the motion. A hearing on the substantive requests shall be scheduled for 2:00 p.m. on September 19, 2019. Response(s) to the motions, if any, shall be filed by 12:00 noon on September 17, 2019. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this order and notice of hearing on Defendants no later than 5:00 p.m. September 9, 2019. (Rivera, Christina)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Healy, Bethaney)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Healy, Bethaney)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Green Earth Energy Photovoltaic Corporation, Christopher Scyocurka, Paige Scyocurka. (Cook, Kathy)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Green Earth Energy Photovoltaic Corporation, Christopher Scyocurka, Paige Scyocurka. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Christopher Scyocurka)(Cook, Kathy)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathy J Cook on behalf of Green Earth Energy Photovoltaic Corporation (Cook, Kathy)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Wilton on behalf of Green Earth Energy Photovoltaic Corporation (Wilton, Timothy)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin H. Duggan on behalf of Green Earth Energy Photovoltaic Corporation (Duggan, Benjamin)
August 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7856678 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Green Earth Energy Photovoltaic Corporation, Paige Scyocurka, Christopher Scyocurka. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Civil Category)(Martin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Earth Energy Photovoltaic Corporation et al v. KeyCorp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keybank National Association
Represented By: Donald R. Frederico
Represented By: Jessica E. Salisbury-Cooper
Represented By: Melanie A. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeyCorp.
Represented By: Donald R. Frederico
Represented By: Jessica E. Salisbury-Cooper
Represented By: Melanie A. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Beebe
Represented By: Donald R. Frederico
Represented By: Jessica E. Salisbury-Cooper
Represented By: Melanie A. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Scyocurka
Represented By: John T. Martin
Represented By: Kathy J Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Earth Energy Photovoltaic Corporation
Represented By: John T. Martin
Represented By: Benjamin H. Duggan
Represented By: Kathy J Cook
Represented By: Timothy J. Wilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paige Scyocurka
Represented By: John T. Martin
Represented By: Kathy J Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?