United States of America v. Arch Insurance Company
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv30125
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Arch Insurance Company.. (Carver, Bradford)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: Scheduling Conference held on 10/29/2019. Colloquy re: status of the case. The Court's prior service as a mediator in a possibly related case was disclosed to the parties. Consent/declination form to be filed by the end of the week. A schedule was established. Scheduling order to issue. If the parties would like to participate in court-sponsored mediation, a joint motion requesting an ADR conference should be filed. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.) (Rivera, Melissa)
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Plaintiff with Certificate of Service. (Martin, William)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Arch Insurance Company. (Chambers, Paula-Lee)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference Set for October 29, 2019. (Chambers, Paula-Lee)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford R. Carver on behalf of Arch Insurance Company (Carver, Bradford)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by United States of America Consent to Proceed before U.S. Magistrate Judge with Certificate of Service (Martin, William)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed on or before the close of business on October 7, 2019. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Rivera, Melissa)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference ISSUED: A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/29/2019 at 2:00 PM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. Joint Statement due by 10/22/2019. See attached Notice for complete details. (Rivera, Melissa)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arch Insurance Company. (Chambers, Paula-Lee)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Arch Insurance Company.(Chambers, Paula-Lee)
September 9, 2019 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund re #1 Complaint,, for $400.00 paid on 09/06/2019, receipt number 0101-7864877 and for $400.00 paid on 09/06/2019, receipt number 0101-7864940. (Adam, Lucien)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Arch Insurance Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Lindsay, Maurice)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arch Insurance Company, Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7864960 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2019: #2 Category Sheet) (Lindsay, Maurice).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Arch Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Paula-Lee Chambers
Represented By: Bradford R. Carver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William E. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?