In Re. Woodard
Appellant: Daniel Woodard
Appellee: IndyMac Federal Bank F.S.B., Deutsche Bank National Trust Co. and Reiner, Reiner and Bendett, P.C.
Not Yet Classified: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv30140
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 Set/Reset Deadlines: Appellee Brief due by 1/8/2020. (Lima, Christine)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellate Brief. Brief due by 1/8/2020 (Lima, Christine)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 8, 2020 to File Response/Reply by Reiner, Reiner and Bendett, P.C..(Trapani, Jeffrey)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 Bankruptcy Record Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Memo in Support)(Vieira, Leonardo) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/11/2019) to rotate pages (Vieira, Leonardo).
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to December 18. (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to December 18 to File Opening Brief, by Daniel Woodard.(Baker, David)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Trapani on behalf of Reiner, Reiner and Bendett, P.C. (Trapani, Jeffrey)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Appellant Brief due by 12/4/2019. Appellee Brief due by 12/18/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 1/2/2020. (Vieira, Leonardo)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Record Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Transmittal of Complete Record)(Vieira, Leonardo)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Copy of Bankruptcy Docket Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Coppola, Katelyn)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 08-03043. File received (Attachments: #1 Initial Transmittal)(Coppola, Katelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re. Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Daniel Woodard
Represented By: David G. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: IndyMac Federal Bank F.S.B.
Represented By: Robert A. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Deutsche Bank National Trust Co.
Represented By: Robert A. McCall
Represented By: Kurt R. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Reiner, Reiner and Bendett, P.C.
Represented By: Jeffery J. Hardiman
Represented By: Jeffrey L. McCormick
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Trapani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Richard T. Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?