United States of America on behalf of and for the use and benefit of Delta Mechanical Contractors, LLC v. Cutter Enterprises, LLC et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Cutter Enterprises, LLC and Arch Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv40008
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting Defendant's Second #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Response due by April 1, 2019. (Calderon, Melissa)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to April 1, 2019 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Arch Insurance Company, Cutter Enterprises, LLC.(Martin, Peter)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Arch Insurance Company answer due 3/1/2019; Cutter Enterprises, LLC answer due 3/1/2019. (Finn, Mary)
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 1, 2019 to to Plead by Arch Insurance Company, Cutter Enterprises, LLC.(Martin, Peter) Modified on 1/31/2019 to change the relief type of the Motion to MOTION to Extend Time to File an Answer. (Finn, Mary). (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/31/2019 with correct signed main document) (Finn, Mary). Modified on 1/31/2019 (Finn, Mary).
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Martin on behalf of Arch Insurance Company, Cutter Enterprises, LLC (Martin, Peter)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Arch Insurance Company, Cutter Enterprises, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Healy, Bethaney)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from Central Division (Worcester) on 01/10/2019 Case Number 4:19-cv-40008. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. (Healy, Bethaney)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Case transferred to Western Division (Springfield).(Burgos, Sandra)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. (Burgos, Sandra)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7485282 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by United States of America on behalf of and for the use and benefit of Delta Mechanical Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Gara, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America on behalf of and for the use and benefit of Delta Mechanical Contractors, LLC v. Cutter Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutter Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Peter J. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter J. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William E. O'Gara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?