U.S. Bank Trust N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust v. Andras et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Defendant: Lori J. Andras and Ameriquest Mortgage Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv30007
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Office of the Commonwealth of Mass., William Francis Galvin, Secretary of Commonwealth return) Received at the Office of the Commonwealth of Mass. on 2/21/2020 and forwarded to: Ameriquest Mortgage Company served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (Finn, Mary)
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Lori J. Andras served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020. (Linehan, Brian)
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Healy, Bethaney)
January 23, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. (Healy, Bethaney)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Reneau J. Longoria on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust (Longoria, Reneau)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank Trust N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Linehan, Brian)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified against Ameriquest Mortgage Company, Lori J. Andras Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8058513 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by U.S. Bank Trust N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Linehan, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank Trust N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust v. Andras et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori J. Andras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameriquest Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Reneau J. Longoria
Represented By: Brian Linehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?