Greyhound Lines, Inc. v. Dawsons Towing and Recovery, LLC
Plaintiff: Greyhound Lines, Inc.
Defendant: Dawsons Towing and Recovery, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv30025
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting he Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Extension of Time o 8/18/2020 to make service on the Defendant, Dawsons Towing and Recovery, LLC. (Finn, Mary)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to August 18, 2020 to Serve the summons and complaint on defendant Dawsons Towing and Recovery, LLC by Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel Dated March 13, 2020, #2 Exhibit Email from Albany County Sheriff's Office Dated April 1, 2020)(Rothschild, Barry)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacques N. Parenteau on behalf of Greyhound Lines, Inc. (Parenteau, Jacques)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dawsons Towing and Recovery, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Lindsay, Maurice)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Greyhound Lines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent FirstGroup America, Inc., Corporate Parent FirstGroup International, Inc., Corporate Parent Laidlaw Transportation Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent First Group, PLC. for Greyhound Lines, Inc... (Lindsay, Maurice)
February 20, 2020 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund re #1 Complaint,, for $400.00 paid on 02/19/2020, receipt number 0101-8115162. (Adam, Lucien)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8115293 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Disclosure Statement, #4 Summons)(Rothschild, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greyhound Lines, Inc. v. Dawsons Towing and Recovery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greyhound Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Barry S. Rothschild
Represented By: Jacques N. Parenteau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawsons Towing and Recovery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?