In Re. Woods et al
Appellant: R. Susan Woods
Appellee: Alina's Real Estate, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv30026
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to file electronically Pro Se by R. Susan Woods.(Lindsay, Maurice)
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION Requesting More Time to File Brief to 30 days by R. Susan Woods. (Lindsay, Maurice)
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Appellant Brief due by 4/7/2020. Appellee Brief due by 4/21/2020. Appellant Reply Brief due by 5/5/2020. (McKillop, Matthew)
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 Bankruptcy Record Received PART 2: #1 Former Appeal Part 1 (Attachments: #1 Former Appeal Part 2, #2 Former Appeal Part 3-1, #3 Former Appeal Part 3-2, #4 Former Appeal Part 4, #5 Former Appeal Part 5, #6 Former Appeal Part 6, #7 Former Appeal Part 7, #8 Former Appeal Part 8, #9 Former Appeal Part 9, #10 Appellee Part 1, #11 Appellee Part 2, #12 Appellee Part 3, #13 Appellee Part 4, #14 Appellee Part 5, #15 Appellee Part 6, #16 Appellee Part 7)(McKillop, Matthew)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Record Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Initial Transmittal, #2 Part 2, #3 Part 3, #4 Part 4, #5 Part 5, #6 Part 6, #7 Part 7, #8 Part 8, #9 Part 9, #10 Part 10, #11 Part 11)(McKillop, Matthew)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Court Trial Transcript of Proceedings held on January 27, 2020, before Honorable Elizabeth D. Katz (Lindsay, Maurice)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by R. Susan Woods re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Motion to Amend Schedule, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Lindsay, Maurice)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 Copy of Bankruptcy Docket Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Coppola, Katelyn)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-03019. File received (Attachments: #1 Initial Transmittal, #2 Bankruptcy Order)(Coppola, Katelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re. Woods et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: R. Susan Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Alina's Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Patrick J. Melnik
Represented By: Steven Weiss
Represented By: Mark J. Esposito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?