Leary v. Diamond Resorts International et al
Plaintiff: Charmaine Leary
Defendant: Diamond Resorts International and Diamond Resorts Financial Services
Case Number: 3:2020cv30112
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 19 First MOTION for Leave to File by Charmaine Leary.(Ryan, Timothy)
September 4, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to #14 First Opposition to #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Diamond Resorts International. (Rodriguez-Vazquez, Teremar)
August 21, 2020 Filing 17 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting, as unopposed, #16 Defendants Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration. Defendants may file a reply not to exceed six pages. (Lindsay, Maurice)
August 20, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration by Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Diamond Resorts International.(Rodriguez-Vazquez, Teremar)
August 14, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Charmaine Leary. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Ryan, Timothy)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 First Opposition re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Charmaine Leary. (Ryan, Timothy)
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 STATE COURT Record All Plaintiffs.. (Rodriguez-Vazquez, Teremar)
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Plaintiffs Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to 8/14/2020 to file opposition to #7 Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration. (Lindsay, Maurice)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/14/2020 to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Charmaine Leary.(Ryan, Timothy)
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. The motion to compel (Dkt. No. #7 ) was edited to replace exhibits 1 & 2 because they contain personal/confidential information and to remove the attached memorandum which incorrectly filed as an attachment, the memorandum is not an appropriate attachment. The CM/ECF procedures require that the memorandum in support must be filed separately and identified accordingly. The memorandum have been removed and docket separately. See (Dkt. No. #9 ) (Lindsay, Maurice)
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Defendant's #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Diamond Resorts International. (Lindsay, Maurice)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Teremar Rodriguez-Vazquez on behalf of Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Diamond Resorts International (Rodriguez-Vazquez, Teremar)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Diamond Resorts International. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law, #2 Affidavit Support of Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit Exh. 1 to Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Exh. 2 to Affidavit)(Rymarski, Jennifer) (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/27/2020) (Lindsay, Maurice). (Attachment 4 replaced on 7/27/2020) (Lindsay, Maurice).
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Defendants Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to 7/27/2020 to File Answer based on the apparent assent of Plaintiffs counsel to such an extension. (Lindsay, Maurice)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to 07/27/2020 to File Answer and Compel Arbitration by Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Diamond Resorts International. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Rymarski, Jennifer)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Remark: A Certified copy of the Notice of Removal has been emailed today to Defendants Counsel for service on the State Court in order to obtain the certified State Court record. (Lindsay, Maurice)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Diamond Resorts International identifying Corporate Parent Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Corporate Parent Diamond Resorts International, Inc. for Diamond Resorts International.. (Rymarski, Jennifer)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Diamond Resorts International ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8326333 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Rymarski, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leary v. Diamond Resorts International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts International
Represented By: Jennifer A. Rymarski
Represented By: Teremar Rodriguez-Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts Financial Services
Represented By: Jennifer A. Rymarski
Represented By: Teremar Rodriguez-Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charmaine Leary
Represented By: Timothy J. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?