Suttles v. Rivers
Petitioner: Frederick Henry Suttles
Respondent: Rivers and Service List
Case Number: 3:2020cv30138
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Danieli, Chris)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-50268.
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 TRANSFERRED to the USDC for Massachusetts, Springfield Division the electronic record (nsf, )
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Petitioner Frederick Henry Suttles, a federal prisoner incarcerated at USP Thomson, brings this 28 U.S.C. 2254 petition challenging his 1993 conviction in Springfield, Massachusetts. Although venue for a 2254 petition exists in either the federal judicial district where a petitioner is in custody or where he was sentenced, see 28 U.S.C 2241(d), where he was convicted and "where... records and witnesses pertinent to petitioner's claim are likely to be found," is generally considered the more appropriate forum. Braden v. 30th Judicial Circuit Court of Kentucky, 410 U.S. 484, 493-94 (1973). In this case, where the petitioner seeks to challenge an older Massachusetts conviction, the sentence for which may or may not still exist, the federal district court in that state appears to be a more appropriate forum. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for Massachusetts, Springfield Division. See 2241(d); see also 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The case in this Court is closed, and all pending motions are terminated from this Court's docket. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/29/2020. Mailed notice (nsf, )
July 29, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (nsf, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 Sworn STATEMENT by Frederick Henry Suttles (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(pg, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Rivers by Michael Love (Love, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice. (jp, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Pursuant to the Fourth Amended General Order 19-0007, dated 6/27/2019, this case is assigned to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin and referred generally to the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/27/2019. (jp, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION by Petitioner Frederick Henry Suttles to Supplement This Case With All Documents from 20cv50227. (jp, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jp, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus by Frederick Henry Suttles against Rivers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (jp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suttles v. Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frederick Henry Suttles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rivers
Represented By: Michael Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Service List
Represented By: Prisoner Correspondence 12 - Internal Use Only
Represented By: AUSA - Rockford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?