Cook v. Albano
Plaintiff: Michael A Cook
Defendant: Albano
Case Number: 3:2020cv30166
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Referring Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Filing 18 Letter/request (non-motion) from Michael A Cook. (Lindsay, Maurice)
December 8, 2020 Filing 17 Copy re #16 Order,,, mailed to Michael Cook on 12/8/20. (Lindsay, Maurice)
December 8, 2020 Filing 16 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ORDER entered as follows: For the reasons stated Accordingly, because Plaintiff has not provided notice to Defendant or certified in writing why such notice should not be required, has not requested any specific relief or demonstrated an emergency, and has not addressed the four requirements for injunctive relief, the court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiffs TRO motion. (Dkt. No. 6.) Plaintiff may file a renewed motion for injunctive relief, but he must (1) either provide notice to Defendant or certify in writing under Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1)(B) why such notice should not be required; (2) address in a memorandum in support of his motion the four injunctive relief requirements set forth above, along with supporting evidence; and (3) request specific injunctive relief. It is So Ordered. See the attached order for complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
December 7, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Finn, Mary)
December 4, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE: re payment of fee by Michael Cook issued to the Treasurer at Berkshire County Jail and House of Correction. (PSSA, 3)
December 3, 2020 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered assessing initial partial filing fee. The Court's previous grant of Plaintiffs motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is no longer conditional. The motions are fully GRANTED. The Court will not take any action on the two letters Plaintiff submitted. Should Plaintiff seek relief from the Court, he must file an appropriate motion. Should he wish to amend or supplement his original complaint, he must do so in accordance with Rule 15 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (PSSA, 3)
December 1, 2020 Filing 12 EXHIBITS with Account Activity Ledger re #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,,,,,,,,, by Michael A Cook. (Lindsay, Maurice)
November 27, 2020 Filing 11 Letter/request (non-motion) from Michael Cook. (Zamorski, Michael)
November 24, 2020 Filing 10 Letter/request (non-motion) from Michael Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Zamorski, Michael)
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Albano. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Castilla, Francis)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 Notice to Plaintiff re service by USMS; Local Rule 4.1 (PSSA, 3)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered conditionally granting 4 , #5 Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis pending the Court's receipt of Plaintiff's prison account statement. The Court requests that the Treasurer of the Berkshire County Jail and House of Correction immediately provide this Court with a six-month prison account statement. The Clerk shall provide Plaintiff with the form for Consent/Refusal of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction and the instructions for that form ("consent package"). The Clerk shall issue a summons for Defendant. Plaintiff is responsible for ensuring that the summons, complaint, consent package, and this order are served on Defendant within 90 days in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Because Plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis, he may elect to have service completed by the United States Marshals Service. The parties shall indicate their consent or refusal to the final assignment of this case to the magistrate judge by completing and separately filing the form for Consent/Refusal of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction within 30 days of the date service on Defendant has been completed. (PSSA, 3)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Michael A Cook. (Lindsay, Maurice)
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael A Cook.(Castilla, Francis)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered. Procedural Order regarding resolution of filling fee. Plaintiff must respond within 21 days. (Castilla, Francis)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Albano, filed by Michael A Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Albano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?