Waters v. Facebook Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rian Waters
Defendant: William Higgins, Katherine Peter, Google LLC., Maura Healey, John Does (1-10), Jeremy Haley, Martha Smith-Blackmore, Aidan Kearney, Facebook Inc. and Jim Dalton
Case Number: 3:2020cv30168
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 35 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Defendants Attorney General Maura Healey and Lt. James Dalton's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Move to Dismiss the Complaint. In addition, in light of the stipulations filed at Dkt. Nos. 25 and 31, the deadline to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint as to Defendants Facebook and Google also shall be extended to January 8, 2021. If Plaintiff amends his complaint before that date, all Defendants' responses shall be filed within 21 days of service of the amended complaint. (Lindsay, Maurice)
December 14, 2020 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Facebook Inc. . (Aronson, Joseph)
December 11, 2020 Filing 33 Opposition re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Facebook Inc.. (Aronson, Joseph)
December 9, 2020 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Facebook Inc.. (Aronson, Joseph)
December 8, 2020 Filing 31 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time for Defendant Google LLC to Answer or Move to Dismiss the Complaint by Google LLC.. (Kirshenbaum, Laura)
December 4, 2020 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Google LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kirshenbaum, Laura)
December 4, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jason B. Mollick Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8539597 by Google LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Attorney Jason B. Mollick, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Attorney Jason B. Mollick)(Kirshenbaum, Laura)
December 4, 2020 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Google LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC... (Kirshenbaum, Laura)
December 3, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura B. Kirshenbaum on behalf of Google LLC. (Kirshenbaum, Laura)
December 3, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan D. Rose, Sr on behalf of Google LLC. (Rose, Alan)
December 3, 2020 Filing 25 STIPULATION Jt Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for D Facebook to Answer or Move to Dismiss Complaint by Facebook Inc.. (Aronson, Joseph)
December 2, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Matan Shacham Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-8534980 by Joseph H. Aronson on behalf of Facebook Inc.. (Aronson, Joseph)
December 2, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Erica Miranda Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8535003 by Joseph H. Aronson on behalf of Facebook Inc.. (Aronson, Joseph)
December 2, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Erica Miranda Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8535003 by Facebook Inc..(Aronson, Joseph)
December 2, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Matan Shacham Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-8534980 by Facebook Inc..(Aronson, Joseph)
December 1, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Aronson on behalf of Facebook Inc. (Aronson, Joseph)
December 1, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Rian Waters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Zamorski, Michael)
December 1, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Rian Waters. (Zamorski, Michael)
December 1, 2020 Filing 17 Plaintiff's Emergency Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunction by Rian Waters.(Zamorski, Michael)
December 1, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed Google LLC. served on 11/18/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (Zamorski, Michael)
December 1, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed Facebook Inc. served on 11/18/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (Zamorski, Michael)
November 25, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/8/2021 to File Answer or Motion to Dismiss by Jim Dalton, Maura Healey.(Batchelor, Andrew)
November 25, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Batchelor on behalf of Jim Dalton, Maura Healey (Batchelor, Andrew)
November 19, 2020 Filing 12 Copy re 11 Order on Motion for TRO,,,, emailed to Rian Waters on 11/19/20 at watersrian@gmail.com (Lindsay, Maurice)
November 18, 2020 Filing 11 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying without prejudice #4 Plaintiff's Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunction. Pursuant to Rule 65(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a temporary restraining order may only be issued without notice to the adverse party if "specific facts in an affidavit or verified complaint clearly show that immediate and irreparable injury, loss, or damage will result to the movant before the adverse party can be heard in opposition" and the movant provides written notice to the court regarding "any efforts made to give notice and the reasons why it should not be required." Plaintiff has not provided any information about his efforts to notify defendants of his motion for emergency relief nor has he explained why such notice should not be required. Without such information the court is unable to grant Plaintiff's motion. Plaintiffs motion is denied without prejudice and Plaintiff may refile the motion after Defendants have been served or with an explanation for why the motion should be granted without notice. (Lindsay, Maurice)
November 17, 2020 Filing 10 Copy re #9 Summons Issued, emailed to Rian Waters on 1/17/20 watersrian@gmail.com (Lindsay, Maurice)
November 16, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Jim Dalton, John Does (1-10), Facebook Inc., Google LLC., Jeremy Haley, Maura Healey, William Higgins, Aidan Kearney, Katherine Peter, Martha Smith-Blackmore. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice)
November 16, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Lindsay, Maurice)
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING MOTION #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rian Waters to Magistrate Judge Robertson(Lindsay, Maurice) Motions referred to Katherine A. Robertson.
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Rian Waters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Zamorski, Michael)
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Rian Waters. (Zamorski, Michael)
November 13, 2020 Filing 4 Plaintiff's Emergency Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunction by Rian Waters.(Zamorski, Michael)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rian Waters.(Zamorski, Michael)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rian Waters. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Zamorski, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waters v. Facebook Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Peter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC.
Represented By: Alan D. Rose, Sr.
Represented By: Laura B. Kirshenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maura Healey
Represented By: Andrew M. Batchelor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Smith-Blackmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aidan Kearney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Joseph H. Aronson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Dalton
Represented By: Andrew M. Batchelor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rian Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?